Lopez-Herrera v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Maria Lopez-Herrera
Respondent: William Barr, Matt Murphy and Chad Wolf
Case Number: 2:2019cv02137
Filed: December 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Filing 13 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Chad Wolf, Matt Murphy, William Barr against Maria Lopez-Herrera. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 2/6/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Dismiss with prejdudice; a certificate of appealability is denied. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/6/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 4, 2020 Filing 11 NON-OPPOSITION to #9 Motion to Dismiss by Respondents William Barr, Matt Murphy, Chad Wolf. (Smith, Brianna)
January 29, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #9 Motion to Dismiss by Petitioner Maria Lopez-Herrera. (Ramsey, Brian)
January 29, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Maria Lopez-Herrera. Responses due by 2/12/2020. (Ramsey, Brian)
January 23, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT as to NV Attorney General re #5 Certified Mail Receipt. (JM)
January 21, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPTS as to ICE Field Office, ICE re Certified Mail Receipt. (Attachments: #1 Receipt) (JM)
January 17, 2020 Filing 6 Service Returned Executed as to USA for District of Nevada on 1/16/2020 re #4 Order. (JM)
January 16, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPTS as to ICE Field (0717); Atty Gen'l NV (0687); William Barr (0700); Chad Wolf (0694); Matt Murphy (0670) re #4 Order, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (JM)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Respondents SHALL FILE AND SERVE an answer or other response to the petition (ECF No. 1) within 20 days of the date that this order. FURTHER ORDERED that all exhibits filed by respondents and petitioner herein SHALL BE FILED with a separate index of exhibits. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/15/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: USM - JM)
December 13, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Maria Lopez-Herrera. (Ramsey, Brian)
December 12, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (MR)
December 12, 2019 Filing 2 EXHIBIT 8 to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Plaintiff Maria Deltransito Lopez-Herrera. (Ramsey, Brian)
December 12, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0978-5809850) by Maria Deltransito Lopez-Herrera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits in Support of Petition)(Ramsey, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez-Herrera v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: Brianna Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matt Murphy
Represented By: Brianna Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Brianna Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Maria Lopez-Herrera
Represented By: Brian J Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?