Kaster v. Select Portfolio Servicing et al
Plaintiff: Danny Kaster
Defendant: Innovis Data Solutions, Inc, Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC and Select Portfolio Servicing
Case Number: 2:2019cv02180
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting #24 Stipulation of Dismissal of Ford Motor Credit Company LLC, with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/4/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 31, 2020 Filing 24 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Ford Motor Credit Company LLC, With Prejudice by Plaintiff Danny Kaster. (Clark, Miles)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting #14 Stipulation to Extend Time re #1 Complaint (First Request). Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/30/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting #10 Motion to Extend Time re #1 Complaint (First Request). Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/30/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 27, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC.(Beverly-Graham, Kiah)
January 24, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (JM)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PROTECTIVE ORDER. ORDER granting #17 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/23/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER granting #16 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 6/22/2020. Motions due by 7/22/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/23/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 22, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Plaintiff Danny Kaster. (Clark, Miles)
January 22, 2020 Filing 16 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Danny Kaster. (Clark, Miles)
January 22, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Select Portfolio Servicing. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/7/2020.(Hernandez, Ramir) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
January 13, 2020 Filing 14 First STIPULATION and Order to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint to January 27, 2020 re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC. (Beverly-Graham, Kiah)
January 13, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Ford Motor Company, Corporate Parent Ford Holdings LLC for Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC added. (Beverly-Graham, Kiah)
January 13, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kiah D. Beverly-Graham on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC. and Kelly H. Dove (Beverly-Graham, Kiah)
January 13, 2020 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/13/2020. In light of #9 Notice of Settlement IT IS ORDERED that all pending discovery and motion deadlines in this matter as between Plaintiff Danny Kaster and Defendant Innovis Data Solutions, Inc. are vacated. The parties shall file either a stipulation of dismissal by March 13, 2020 or a joint motion to extend time to file such a stipulation. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
January 10, 2020 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing. (Hernandez, Ramir)
January 10, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Settlement with Innovis Data Solutions, Inc. by Danny Kaster. (Plaksin, Shaina)
January 7, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Danny Kaster re #1 Complaint,, #3 Summons Issued. Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC served on 12/23/2019. (Plaksin, Shaina)
December 24, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Select Portfolio Servicing that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent SPS Holding Corp., Corporate Parent Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Group, Corporate Parent Credit Suisse for Select Portfolio Servicing added. (Hernandez, Ramir)
December 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ramir Mitchell Hernandez on behalf of Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing. (Hernandez, Ramir)
December 20, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Danny Kaster re #3 Summons Issued. Innovis Data Solutions, Inc waiver sent on 12/20/2019, answer due 2/18/2020. (Plaksin, Shaina)
December 18, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
December 18, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (MR)
December 18, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (MR)
December 18, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Danny Kaster. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Krieger, David)
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5817093) by Danny Kaster. Proof of service due by 3/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons FMC, #3 Summons Innovis, #4 Summons SPS)(Krieger, David) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaster v. Select Portfolio Servicing et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Innovis Data Solutions, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC
Represented By: Kelly H Dove
Represented By: Kiah D. Beverly-Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing
Represented By: R. Samuel Ehlers
Represented By: Ramir Mitchell Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Kaster
Represented By: Shaina R Plaksin
Represented By: Miles N Clark
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Represented By: Matthew I Knepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?