Lavoll v. Howell et al
Case Number: 2:2019cv02249
Filed: January 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 23 Motion to Extend Time Re: 19 Motion to Dismiss; Responses due by 6/7/2021. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/26/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 15 Motion to Extend Time to File Amended Petition. Amended Petition due by 2/22/2021. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/23/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Re: 5 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. IT IS ORDERED that counsel for petitioner meet with petitioner as soon as reasonably possible, if counsel has not already done so, to: (a) review the procedures applicable in cases under 28 U.S. C. § 2254; (b) discuss and explore with petitioner, as fully as possible, the potential grounds for habeas corpus relief in petitioner's case; and (c) advise petitioner that all possible grounds for habeas corpus relief must be raised at this time in this action and that the failure to do so will likely result in any omitted grounds being barred from future review. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner has 90 days from the date of this order to file and serve on responde nts an amended petition for writ of habeas corpus that includes all known grounds for relief (both exhausted and unexhausted). See Order for details. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/24/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting 11 Motion for Appointment of Counsel; The FPD is appointed to represent the petitioner. The Clerk shall electronically serve the FPD a copy of this order with a copy of the 5 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. The FPD has 30 da ys to file a notice of appearance or indicate to the court its inability to represent petitioner. The previous briefing schedule set forth in ECF 9 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/30/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; order and petition emailed to FPD - DRS)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDERED: The Clerk of Court is to add Attorney General to this case and Electronically Serve the 5 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Terrance L. Lavoll upon same. Response/Answer due within 90 days, with any Reply due within 45 days of service of answer. Please see Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/29/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF with Petition electronically sent to AG as directed. - DRS)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED: Petitioner shall have 30 days from the entry of this order to show cause and file such proof as directed by this Order. Notice of Compliance is due by 5/7/2020. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/7/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 USCA ORDER. The Clerk will transfer the proposed section 2254 petition filed at Docket Entry No. 1, to the United States District Court for the District of Nevada. The proposed petition is deemed filed in the district court on November 26, 2019, the date on which it was delivered to prison authorities for forwarding to this court. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lavoll v. Howell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?