Onyx & Rose, LLC v. T1 Payments, LLC
Plaintiff: Onyx & Rose, LLC
Defendant: T1 Payments LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00008
Filed: January 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Kent J Dawson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Settlement by Onyx & Rose, LLC. (Ewing, Kyle)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting #28 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: #17 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 2/25/2020. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 2/20/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 18, 2020 Filing 28 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Third Request) to Extend Deadline for Plaintiff to Respond re #17 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Onyx & Rose, LLC. (Ewing, Kyle)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting #24 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: #17 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 2/18/2020. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 2/3/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting #23 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney William T. Repasky terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 2/3/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting #21 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: #17 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 2/4/2020. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 1/24/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 31, 2020 Filing 24 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) for Plaintiff to Respond re #17 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Onyx & Rose, LLC. (Ewing, Kyle)
January 30, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Kyle A. Ewing, Esq. in for Attorney William T. Repasky, Esq. by Plaintiff Onyx & Rose, LLC. (Ewing, Kyle)
January 16, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kyle A. Ewing on behalf of Plaintiff Onyx & Rose, LLC. (Ewing, Kyle)
January 16, 2020 Filing 21 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #17 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Onyx & Rose, LLC. (Ewing, Kyle)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting #19 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorneys David Domene and Emily C. Lamb terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 1/10/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 9, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Kory L. Kaplan in for Attorney David Domene and Emily C. Lamb by Defendant T1 Payments LLC. (Kaplan, Kory)
January 7, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by T1 Payments LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (Kaplan, Kory)
January 7, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Petition for Removal, by Defendant T1 Payments LLC. Responses due by 1/21/2020. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 2/21/2020. (Kaplan, Kory) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
January 7, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kory Logan Kaplan on behalf of Defendant T1 Payments LLC. (Kaplan, Kory)
January 2, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel William T. Repasky, David Domene and Emily C. Lamb to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 2/16/2020. (no image attached) (ADR)
January 2, 2020 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of Kentucky Western; Case Number 3:19-cv-00489. Original file with transfer order and docket sheet received. (ADR)
January 2, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (ADR)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III on 12/23/2019. Defendant's motion (DN #6 ) is DENIED IN PART and GRANTED IN PART. Dismissal is DENIED and transfer pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court shall TRANSFER the action to the United States District Court for the District of Nevada at Las Vegas. (ALS) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 1/2/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM OPINION by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III on 12/23/2019. For the reasons stated herein, a separate order will be entered this date in accordance with this opinion. (ALS) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 1/2/2020.]
August 19, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Change Venue filed by T1 Payments, LLC. (Lamb, Emily) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 1/2/2020.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Onyx & Rose, LLC. (Repasky, William) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 1/2/2020.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to re #6 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Change Venue , RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Change Venue ( Replies due by 8/19/2019.) filed by Onyx & Rose, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Repasky, William) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 1/2/2020.]
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III. (KD) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 1/2/2020.]
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Claria Horn Boom recused. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III for all further proceedings. cc: Counsel of Record, Senior Judge Simpson's Case Manager (KD) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 1/2/2020.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Change Venue by Defendant T1 Payments, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - CPPA --Onyx and Rose, #2 Proposed Order Dismiss, #3 Proposed Order Change of Venue) (Lamb, Emily) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 1/2/2020.]
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE: re #1 Notice of Removal from Jefferson Circuit Court, Civil Action Number 19-CI-3447. cc: Counsel, Jefferson Circuit Court. (AME) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 1/2/2020.]
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Claria Horn Boom. (AME) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 1/2/2020.]
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily C. Lamb on behalf of T1 Payments, LLC. (AME) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 1/2/2020.]
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by T1 Payments, LLC. (AME) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 1/2/2020.]
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by T1 Payments, LLC from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-3447. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2898249), filed by T1 Payments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A) (AME) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 1/2/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Onyx & Rose, LLC v. T1 Payments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Onyx & Rose, LLC
Represented By: William T. Repasky
Represented By: Kyle A. Ewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T1 Payments LLC
Represented By: David Domene
Represented By: Emily C. Lamb
Represented By: Kory Logan Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?