Middleton v. Snowed Inn, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Alexandra Middleton
Defendant: Snowed Inn, LLC and McDonald's Corporation
Case Number: 2:2020cv00017
Filed: January 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Stipulation; McDonald's Corporation answer due 3/5/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/26/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 25, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaint, by Defendant McDonald's Corporation. (Smith, Jason)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying #11 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/25/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER setting Early Neutral Evaluation session. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 4/9/2020 at 09:00 AM in LV Chambers, Room 3071 before Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. A pre-ENE telephonic conference is set for April 8, 2020, at 3:00 p.m. This telephonic conference is for Judge Weksler and counsel only. Counsel must call 877-810-9415, access code 2365998. Each party's written evaluation must be submitted directly to Judge Weksler's chambers Room 3071 by 4:00 PM on April 1, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 2/21/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 20, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaint, by Defendant McDonald's Corporation. (Santoro, Nicholas)
February 20, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #8 Answer to Complaint, by Defendant Snowed Inn, LLC. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Bonds, Kurt)
February 20, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by McDonald's Corporation, Snowed Inn, LLC.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Bonds, Kurt) Modified on 2/21/2020 to reflect additional filing party (MMM).
February 20, 2020 Filing 8 VIEW #10 corrected image to ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by McDonald's Corporation Snowed Inn, LLC. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 4/5/2020.(Bonds, Kurt) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified on 2/21/2020 (MMM).
February 7, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alexandra Middleton re #1 Complaint, #5 Summons Issued. McDonald's Corporation served on 1/30/2020. (Lagomarsino, Andre)
February 7, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alexandra Middleton re #1 Complaint, #5 Summons Issued. Snowed Inn, LLC served on 1/31/2020. (Lagomarsino, Andre)
January 6, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (JM)
January 6, 2020 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (JM)
January 5, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (JM)
January 5, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Alexandra Middleton. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Lagomarsino, Andre)
January 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5832834) by Alexandra Middleton. Proof of service due by 4/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Lagomarsino, Andre) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Middleton v. Snowed Inn, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snowed Inn, LLC
Represented By: Kurt R. Bonds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDonald's Corporation
Represented By: Kurt R. Bonds
Represented By: Jason D Smith
Represented By: Nicholas J Santoro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandra Middleton
Represented By: Andre M. Lagomarsino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?