Reflex Media, Inc. et al v. Richard Easton Limited et al
Plaintiff: Reflex Media, Inc. and Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD.
Defendant: DOES 1-10, inclusive, Maria Jose Diaz, Richard Easton, Richard Easton Limited, Jorge Osbaldo Rodriguez and Nelida Tejeda Alvarez
Case Number: 2:2020cv00051
Filed: January 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2020 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to Richard Easton, Richard Easton Limited re #1 Complaint. (JQC)
February 20, 2020 Filing 16 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Richard Easton and Richard Easton Limited by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD., Reflex Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Smith, Mark)
January 29, 2020 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Richard Easton, Richard Easton Limited. (JM)
January 28, 2020 Filing 14 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Richard Easton Limited by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD., Reflex Media, Inc.. (Smith, Mark)
January 28, 2020 Filing 13 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Richard Easton by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD., Reflex Media, Inc.. (Smith, Mark)
January 23, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Maria Jose Diaz re #1 Complaint. (JQC)
January 23, 2020 Filing 11 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Maria Jose Diaz by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD., Reflex Media, Inc.. (Smith, Mark)
January 14, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Maria Jose Diaz, Richard Easton, Richard Easton Limited, Jorge Osbaldo Rodriguez, Nelida Tejeda Alvarez re #1 Complaint. (JQC)
January 14, 2020 Filing 9 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Jorge Osbaldo Rodriguez by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD., Reflex Media, Inc.. (Smith, Mark)
January 14, 2020 Filing 8 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Maria Jose Diaz by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD., Reflex Media, Inc.. (Smith, Mark)
January 14, 2020 Filing 7 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Nelida Tejeda by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD., Reflex Media, Inc.. (Smith, Mark)
January 14, 2020 Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Richard Easton by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD., Reflex Media, Inc.. (Smith, Mark)
January 14, 2020 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Richard Easton Limited by Plaintiffs Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD., Reflex Media, Inc.. (Smith, Mark)
January 9, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD., Reflex Media, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate W8 Tech Limited for Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD., Reflex Media, Inc. added. (Smith, Mark)
January 9, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
January 9, 2020 Filing 2 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (JQC) (Main Document 2 replaced on 1/9/2020) (JQC).
January 9, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (JQC)
January 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5839547) by Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD., Reflex Media, Inc.. Proof of service due by 4/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Index Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit 1 - Seeking Arrangements Terms of Use (effective October 30, 2018), #3 Exhibit 2 - Seeking Arrangements Terms of Use (effective May 8, 2018), #4 Exhibit 3 - SEEKING ARRANGEMENT Trademark Registration #1, #5 Exhibit 4 - SEEKING ARRANGEMENT Trademark Registration #2, #6 Exhibit 5 - SEEKINGARRANGEMENT Trademark Registration, #7 Exhibit 6 - SA Trademark Registration, #8 Exhibit 7 - SEEKING Trademark Registration, #9 Exhibit 8 - SEEKING MILLIONAIRE Trademark Registration, #10 Exhibit 9 - Webpage Metadata From FirstDateClub.com, #11 Exhibit 10 - FirstDateClub.coms Facebook Webpage, #12 Exhibit 11 - FirstDateClub.coms Instagram Webpage and Individual Postings, #13 Exhibit 12 - FirstDateClub.coms Twitter Webpage, #14 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Smith, Mark) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reflex Media, Inc. et al v. Richard Easton Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reflex Media, Inc.
Represented By: Jacob L. Fonnesbeck
Represented By: Mark L Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clover8 Investments PTE. LTD.
Represented By: Jacob L. Fonnesbeck
Represented By: Mark L Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Jose Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Easton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Easton Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Osbaldo Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelida Tejeda Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?