Franklin v. Hernandez et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Franklin
Defendant: S Macye, Jerry Howell, Hernandez and Dreesen
Case Number: 2:2020cv00063
Filed: January 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Richard F Boulware
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by Plaintiff Jeffrey Franklin. Address updated to: 7241 High Cascade, Las Vegas, NV 89129. (ADR)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Jeffrey Franklin. (JM)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice re AMENDED COMPLAINT by Jeffrey Franklin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (JM)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (DRS)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jeffrey Franklin. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Motion for Appointment of Counsel) (DRS)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franklin v. Hernandez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Macye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dreesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?