Gardner v. Walmart Inc.
Plaintiff: Nicole G. Gardner
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00071
Filed: January 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of FRCP 26(f) Conference by Nicole G. Gardner. (Cullen, Lindsay)
February 10, 2020 Filing 7 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Removal by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Wessel, Megan)
February 10, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Nicole G. Gardner. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Cullen, Paul)
January 10, 2020 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
January 10, 2020 Filing 4 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Wessel, Megan)
January 10, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Walmart Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Wessel, Megan)
January 10, 2020 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/10/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 1/25/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 2/9/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
January 10, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (JQC)
January 10, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Clark County District Court, Case Number A-19-803554-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5841807) by Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (Wessel, Megan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gardner v. Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole G. Gardner
Represented By: Lindsay K Cullen
Represented By: Paul R.M. Cullen
Represented By: Paul Cullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Robert K. Phillips
Represented By: Latisha Robinson
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Wessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?