Hannah v. Lombardo et al
Plaintiff: Michael Earl Hannah
Defendant: Lombardo and Velasco Lopez
Case Number: 2:2020cv00087
Filed: January 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/14/2020. This action was received on* 1/13/2020* pursuant to a court order directing transfer from the* Western District of Washington* and assigned case number 2:20-cv-00087-JAD-DJA. All future documents must bear said correct case number. Joint Status Report due by 2/13/2020. Verified Petition due by 2/28/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 14, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (JM)
January 14, 2020 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Washington Western; Case Number 2:19-cv-01982. Original file with transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 13, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated. (SG) [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/14/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF TRANSFER by Judge Richard A. Jones re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Michael Earl Hannah. (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)(SG) [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/14/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Michael Earl Hannah. (Attachments: #1 Proposed 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Prison Trust Account Statement)(SG) [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/14/2020.]
December 20, 2019 IFP deficiency corrected (SG) [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/14/2020.]
December 5, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER sent re IFP deficiency; - The proper IFP form was not submitted. Enclosed please find the correct IFP form to be filled out in full and returned to the Court. Filer has until 1/6/2020 to correct (SG) [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/14/2020.]
December 2, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff Michael Earl Hannah. (Attachments: #1 Proposed 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Prison Trust Account Statement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(SG) [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/14/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hannah v. Lombardo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lombardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velasco Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Earl Hannah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?