The Neck Hammock, Inc. v. DFO Global Performance Commerce Limited et al
Plaintiff: The Neck Hammock, Inc.
Defendant: Health and Sole, Strong Current Enterprises, Limited, DFO Global Performance Commerce Limited and Think Tech Enterprises, Ltd
Case Number: 2:2020cv00222
Filed: January 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Robert C Jones
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER approving ECF No. #11 / #13 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Brian N. Platt on behalf of Plaintiff The Neck Hammock, Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Jessica M. Lujan. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/17/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
March 17, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #11 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition by Plaintiff The Neck Hammock, Inc.. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Boyle, James)
March 17, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to #11 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition. Attorney James Boyle advised to review document #11 . Local counsel signature on page 5 of document is missing. Please make the necessary corrections and file a notice of corrected image/document and link to motion #11 .. (no image attached) (WJ)
March 16, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Brian N. Platt and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jessica M. Lujan (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5928764) by Plaintiff The Neck Hammock, Inc.. (Boyle, James)
February 13, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by The Neck Hammock, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Neck Hammock Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Uproar Ventures LLC for The Neck Hammock, Inc. added. (Boyle, James)
February 13, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to #8 Certificate of Interested Parties. Attorney James Boyle advised to refile your certificate of interested parties. Page 2 of document #8 states that there are a parent company and corporate affiliates: i.e. The Neck Hammock, Inc., Neck Hammock Holdings, LLC., and Uproar Ventures, LLC. The certificate of interested party entry has a clear warning in the entry stating: "Please Note: you must add ALL Corporate Parents and/or Corporate Affiliates to the case. Failing to add all interested parties listed on the certificate will result in a notice from the court." Furthermore, LR 7.1-1 (a), in regards to certificate of interested parties, states in part: "These representations are made to enable judges of the Court to evaluate possible disqualifications or recusal. Therefore it is requested that you properly refile your certificate of interested parties. (no image attached) (WJ)
February 12, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by The Neck Hammock, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Boyle, James)
February 3, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Judge Robert C. Jones for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:20-cv-00222-RCJ-NJK. (no image attached) (MMM)
January 31, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/31/2020. The Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon is no longer assigned to this case. Pursuant to General Order No. 2011-03, IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment to one of the designated patent pilot program judges for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CS)
January 31, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (JM)
January 31, 2020 Filing 4 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (JM)
January 31, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Brent Lorimer, Brian Platt to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 3/16/2020. (no image attached) (JM)
January 31, 2020 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DFO Global Performance Commerce Limited, Health and Sole, John Does 1-10, Strong Current Enterprises, Limited, Think Tech Enterprises, Ltd (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5869161) by The Neck Hammock, Inc.. Proof of service due by 4/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons DFO Global Performance Commerce Limited, #3 Summons Health and Sole, #4 Summons Strong Current Enterprisese, Limited, #5 Summons Think Tech Enterprises, Ltd) (Boyle, James) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
January 31, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Nature of Suit: 830 Patent Case (JM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Neck Hammock, Inc. v. DFO Global Performance Commerce Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health and Sole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strong Current Enterprises, Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DFO Global Performance Commerce Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Think Tech Enterprises, Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Neck Hammock, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica M Lujan
Represented By: Brent Lorimer
Represented By: Brian N. Platt
Represented By: James D. Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?