U.S.A. Dawgs, Inc. v. Mojave Desert Holdings LLC et al
Defendant: Dawgs Holdings, LLC
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Appellee: Mojave Desert Holdings LLC and Gemcap Lendings I LLC
Appellant: U.S.A. Dawgs, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00261
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that #3 Appellant's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of this Bankruptcy Appeal is GRANTED. This action is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/17/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
February 14, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Dawgs Holdings, LLC. Responses due by 2/28/2020. (Higgins, Brigid)
February 6, 2020 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/6/2020. IT IS ORDERED that the designation of reporters and recorders transcripts (if any) as required by Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009(a) shall be filed with the clerk of bankruptcy court so the certificate of readiness may be transmitted timely to the district court. If the designation was previously filed with the clerk of BAP, counsel shall file a copy of the same with the clerk of bankruptcy court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all future documents filed in connection with this appeal shall bear the bankruptcy case number, adversary case number (if any) and the district court civil case number. For Bankruptcy Appeals, Attorneys are required to file Verified Petitions in accordance with LR IA 11-2. Verified Petition due by 3/22/2020. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 6, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT, Bankruptcy Court case number BK1810453gs. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Referral, #2 Transmittal, #3 Appeal memorandum) (ADR)
February 6, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. (ADR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S.A. Dawgs, Inc. v. Mojave Desert Holdings LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Represented By: U.S. Trustee, Las Vegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Mojave Desert Holdings LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth E. Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Gemcap Lendings I LLC
Represented By: Ogonna M Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: U.S.A. Dawgs, Inc.
Represented By: Saul S. Rostamian
Represented By: Brigid Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawgs Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Brigid Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?