Haus et al v. Bank of New York et al
Plaintiff: Eva Berou and Ronald Haus
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon and Sables LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00263
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Association of Counsel by Nicholas Belay on behalf of Defendant Bank of New York Mellon. (Belay, Nicholas)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: #1 Complaint. Bank of New York Mellon answer due 4/7/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/13/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 13, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Ronald Haus. (Yergensen, Christopher)
March 5, 2020 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/5/2020. Pending before the Court is a stipulation to extend time. Docket No. 11. Because the stipulation provides no reason for the relief requested, it is DENIED without prejudice. Local Rule IA 6-1(a). IT IS SO ORDERED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TM)
March 4, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Ronald Haus. (Yergensen, Christopher)
March 4, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ronald Haus. Sables LLC served on 2/21/2020. (Yergensen, Christopher)
March 4, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ronald Haus. Bank of New York Mellon served on 2/24/2020. (Yergensen, Christopher)
March 2, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Sables LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Wade, Shadd)
March 2, 2020 Filing 7 DECLARATION of of Non-Monetary Status re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Sables LLC. (Wade, Shadd)
February 11, 2020 Filing 6 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
February 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #3 Certificate of Interested Parties by Plaintiff Ronald Haus. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Yergensen, Christopher)
February 10, 2020 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #3 Certificate of Interested Parties. Document does not contain case number. Counsel is advised to file a Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #3 . (no image attached) (SLD)
February 10, 2020 Filing 3 VIEW Corrected Image #5 re: CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Ronald Haus. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Yergensen, Christopher) Modified on 2/10/2020 (SLD).
February 6, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (ADR)
February 6, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (ADR)
February 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bank of New York Mellon FKA The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Benefit of the Certificateholders of the CWALT, Inc., Alternative Loan Trust 2004-J09, Mortgage Pass Through Certificates, Series 20 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5877588) by Ronald Haus. Proof of service due by 5/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Yergensen, Christopher) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haus et al v. Bank of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Natalie L Winslow
Represented By: Nicholas Belay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sables LLC
Represented By: Shadd A. Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Berou
Represented By: Christopher Yergensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Haus
Represented By: Christopher Yergensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?