U.S. Bank National Association v. United States of America
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2020cv00382
Filed: February 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal, filed by United States of America. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 6/8/2020.(Stevko, Alexander) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Extend Time; United States of America answer due 4/27/2020. Discovery Hearing set for 5/18/2020 at 10:00 AM. The call-in telephone number is (888)273-3658, access code: 3912597. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/25/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 25, 2020 Filing 8 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant United States of America. (Stevko, Alexander)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Re: #4 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time. Motion Hearing reset for 4/3/2020 at 01:00 PM in LV Chambers before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. The call-in telephone number is (888)273-3658, access code: 3912597. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/24/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a telephonic hearing on #4 the United States of America's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint is scheduled for 11:00 AM, 3/27/20. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/23/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 18, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #4 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time by Plaintiff U.S. Bank National Association. (Schuler-Hintz, Kristin)
March 13, 2020 Filing 4 First MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to respond to complaint re #1 Petition for Removal, by Defendant United States of America. (Stevko, Alexander)
March 9, 2020 Filing 3 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant United States of America. (Stevko, Alexander)
February 25, 2020 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 2/25/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 3/11/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 3/26/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 25, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (JM)
February 25, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court of Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-20-808977-C, by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Stevko, Alexander) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank National Association v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Kristin A Schuler-Hintz
Represented By: Shane P. Gale
Represented By: Shane Patrick Gale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Alexander E. Stevko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?