HCB Enterprises, LLC v. Dickey's Barbecue Restaurants, Inc.
Plaintiff: HCB Enterprises, LLC
Defendant: Dickey's Barbecue Restaurants, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00407
Filed: February 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay Case by Defendant Dickey's Barbecue Restaurants, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Declaration of Jeff Gruber, #2 Exhibit to Declaration (1-7)) (Andrews, Tyler)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Stipulation; Dickey's Barbecue Restaurants, Inc. answer due 4/20/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/26/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 23, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint [First Request] re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Dickey's Barbecue Restaurants, Inc.. (Andrews, Tyler)
March 23, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Tyler Ryan Andrews on behalf of Defendant Dickey's Barbecue Restaurants, Inc.. (Andrews, Tyler)
March 4, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HCB Enterprises, LLC re #1 Complaint,, #3 Summons Issued, #2 Certificate of Interested Parties,. Dickey's Barbecue Restaurants, Inc. served on 2/28/2020. (Fountain, Jonathan)
February 27, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Dickey's Barbecue Restaurants, Inc. (JM)
February 26, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (JM)
February 26, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by HCB Enterprises, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Shaun Martin, Other Affiliate Carrie Floater for HCB Enterprises, LLC added. (Fountain, Jonathan)
February 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dickey's Barbecue Restaurants, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5905487) by HCB Enterprises, LLC. Proof of service due by 5/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Article - "Can Dickey's Barbecue Franchise Owners Survive?", #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (Fountain, Jonathan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HCB Enterprises, LLC v. Dickey's Barbecue Restaurants, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dickey's Barbecue Restaurants, Inc.
Represented By: Tyler Ryan Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HCB Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan W Fountain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?