Allstate Insurance Company et al v. Nassiri et al
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company and Allstate Indemnity Company
Defendant: Obteen N. Nassiri and Med Ed Labs
Case Number: 2:2020cv00425
Filed: February 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting #43 Motion to Deposit Funds. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/27/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 23, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION to Deposit Funds re #34 Objection/Appeal by Plaintiffs Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Responses due by 5/7/2020. (Gorlin, Lee) Modified on 4/23/2020 to add document link (MMM).
April 16, 2020 Filing 42 RESPONSE to #34 Objection/Appeal Magistrate Judge Order/Ruling LR IB 3-1 by Plaintiffs Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Todd, Dylan)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting #7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/10/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 10, 2020 Filing 40 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 4/10/2020. For good cause appearing therein and consistent with the Courts prior Order (ECF No. 36), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT #38 Motion for Leave to File Document is granted. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KB)
April 9, 2020 Filing 39 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Todd, Dylan)
April 9, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION for Leave to File to File Under Seal Exhibit F to Plainitffs' Reply in Support of Its Motion for Preliminary Injunction to Correct Inadvertant Unsealed Filing [ECF 37] re 37 Exhibit, by Plaintiffs Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Todd, Dylan)
April 7, 2020 Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 4/7/2020. ORDER granting #29 Motion to Seal. Having found that Plaintiffs meet the Ninth Circuit's compelling reasons standard to seal documents attached as Exhibit 6 to their Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Seal (ECF No. 29) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file Exhibit 6 under seal on the docket. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KL)
April 3, 2020 Filing 35 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Telephonic Motion Hearing re Plaintiffs' #7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction held on 4/3/2020 before Judge James C. Mahan. Crtrm Administrator: NEV; Pla Counsel: Dylan Todd, Esq.; Def Counsel: Robert Frizell, Esq.; Court Reporter: Shayna Montgomery; Time of Hearing: 11:00 a.m. - 11:16 a.m.; Courtroom: 6A.The Court makes preliminary statements and hears arguments of counsel regarding Plaintiffs' #7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. As stated on the record, Plaintiffs' #7 Motion is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court finds no bond is necessary. Mr. Todd is to submit a proposed order for the Court's review. The Court adjourns. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
April 2, 2020 Filing 34 OBJECTION/APPEAL Magistrate Judge order or ruling under LR IB 3-1 re #33 Order on Motion to Quash, by Defendant Med Ed Labs. Responses due by 4/16/2020. (Frizell, Robert)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that #32 Plaintiffs' Motion for to Quash Defendant's Notice of Demand for Security of Costs Pursuant to NRS 18.130(1) and Stay of the Case is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 4/2/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 2, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION to Quash Demand for Cost Bond re #31 Notice (Other) by Plaintiffs Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Todd, Dylan)
April 1, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE Defendant Med Ed Labs Notice of (1) Demand for Security for Costs and (2) Stay of Case by Med Ed Labs. (Frizell, Robert)
March 30, 2020 Filing 30 CLERK'S NOTICE of violation of Local Rules. ECF No. #27 was not filed pursuant to LR IA 10-3(d). An index of exhibits was not provided. Attorney Dylan Todd is advised in the future to file documents pursuant to the Local Rules. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. Do NOT refile. (no image attached) (MMM)
March 27, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION to Seal #27 Reply Exhibit F, by Plaintiffs Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Todd, Dylan)
March 27, 2020 Filing 28 DECLARATION re #27 Reply, by Plaintiffs Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Todd, Dylan)
March 27, 2020 Filing 27 REPLY to Response to #7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit) (Todd, Dylan)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that #16 MEL's motion to dissolve be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/26/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 26, 2020 Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 3/26/2020. ORDER granting #19 Motion to Seal; Having found that Plaintiffs have met the Ninth Circuits standard to seal, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibit A (ECF No. 19) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file an unredacted version of Exhibit A under seal on the docket. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KB)
March 25, 2020 Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE of violation of Local Rules. ECF No. #22 was not filed pursuant to LR IA 10-3. Copies of pleadings or other documents filed in the pending matter must not be attached as exhibits or made part of an appendix. Attorney Dylan Todd is advised in the future to file documents pursuant to the local rules. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. Do NOT refile. (no image attached) (MMM)
March 25, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE to #16 Motion to Vacate by Plaintiffs Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Replies due by 4/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Todd, Dylan)
March 24, 2020 Filing 21 ERRATA to #20 Exhibit, by Plaintiffs Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Todd, Dylan)
March 24, 2020 Filing 20 EXHIBIT (Redacted) Exhibit A re #17 RESPONSE to #13 Motion by Plaintiffs Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Todd, Dylan) Modified on 3/24/2020 to reflect correct docket entry relationship (MMM).
March 24, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Seal Exhibit A to #17 Response, by Plaintiffs Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Todd, Dylan) Modified text on 3/24/2020 (MMM).
March 23, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE to #7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Defendant Med Ed Labs. Replies due by 3/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Frizell, Robert)
March 23, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE to #13 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time by Plaintiffs Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 restricted per FRCP 5.2 and LR IC 6-1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Todd, Dylan)
March 20, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Vacate #3 Order on Motion for TRO by Defendant Med Ed Labs. (Frizell, Robert)
March 19, 2020 Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 3/19/2020 Re: #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company.The Motion Hearing set for 4/1/2020 at 10:30 AM has been vacated and continued to 4/3/2020 at 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6A before Judge James C. Mahan. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that counsel shall appear telephonically by calling the Court conference line at 888-363-4734 at least five minutes prior to the hearing. The access code is 6910695. In order to ensure a clear recording of the hearing, the call must be made using a land line phone. Cell phone calls, as well as the use of a speaker phone, are prohibited. Please note the parties are asked to remain silent until their case is called. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED ADJUDGED AND DECREED that #13 plaintiff's motion to extend time be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED in part. Responses due before 5:00 p.m. 3/23/2020. Replies due before 5:00 p.m. 3/27/2020.Motion Hearing reset for 4/1/2020 at 10:30 AM in LV Courtroom 6A. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/16/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 13, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re #1 Complaint and #8 Order,, by Defendant Med Ed Labs. (Frizell, Robert) Modified text on 3/13/2020 (MMM).
March 13, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Robert Duane Frizell on behalf of Defendant Med Ed Labs. (Frizell, Robert) Modified text on 3/13/2020 (MMM).
March 13, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Robert Duane Frizell on behalf of Defendant Med Ed Labs. (Frizell, Robert) Modified event on 3/13/2020 (MMM).
March 13, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. Obteen N. Nassiri waiver sent on 3/12/2020, answer due 5/11/2020. (Todd, Dylan)
March 13, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company re #1 Complaint,. Med Ed Labs served on 3/11/2020. (Todd, Dylan)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. The court now sets a preliminary injunction hearing on Wednesday, 3/18/2020, at 10:00 a.m. in courtroom 6A. The court hereby orders the following expedited briefing schedule for #7 the motion for preliminary injunction. Obteen N. Nassiri and Med Ed Labs ("defendants") shall file their response to plaintiff's motion before 5:00 p.m. on Friday, 3/13/2020. Plaintiff shall file its reply, if any, before 12:00 noon on Monday, 3/16/2020. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/11/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) Modified to add docket text re: hearing on 3/11/2020 (MR).
March 10, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Responses due by 3/24/2020. (Todd, Dylan)
March 9, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (MR)
March 9, 2020 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Obteen N. Nassiri by Plaintiffs Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Todd, Dylan)
March 9, 2020 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Med Ed Labs by Plaintiffs Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Todd, Dylan)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/9/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 6, 2020 Filing 2 EX PARTE MOTION for a Temporary Restraining Order Pursuant to FRCP 65(b) by Plaintiffs Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Dylan P. Todd) (Todd, Dylan) Modified event on 3/8/2020 (MMM).
February 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400) by Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. Proof of service due by 5/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (MR)
February 28, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (MR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Company et al v. Nassiri et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Dylan P Todd
Represented By: Lee H. Gorlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Dylan P Todd
Represented By: Lee H. Gorlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Dylan P Todd
Represented By: Lee H. Gorlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By: Dylan P Todd
Represented By: Lee H. Gorlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Obteen N. Nassiri
Represented By: Robert Duane Frizell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Med Ed Labs
Represented By: Robert Duane Frizell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?