Love v. Medical Unit E FMWCC et al
Plaintiff: Sherri L. Love
Defendant: Medical Unit E FMWCC and NDOC Warden
Case Number: 2:2020cv00525
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 4/23/2020. CONFORMED COPIES: If you wish to receive a file-stamped copy of any pleading or other paper please submit one additional copy and, if by mail, a self-addressed, postage-paid envelope. A party who is granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis need not submit a selfaddressed, postage-paid envelope. See Local Rule 10-1. OTHER: Courtesy Copy of first page of IFP (ECF #4 ). (Attachments: #1 Letter) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 16, 2020 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Sherri L. Love. (MR)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #1 Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED without prejudice to file a new fully complete application. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall retain #1 -1 the complaint but will not file it at this time. IFP/filing fees due within sixty (60) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 3/17/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - Inmate IFP instructions/form sent to P - MR)
March 13, 2020 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (MR)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Sherri L. Love. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (MR)
March 12, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Love v. Medical Unit E FMWCC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Unit E FMWCC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NDOC Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherri L. Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?