JoshCo Tech, LLC v. Does 1-4, the owners and operators of vetbcg.com
Plaintiff: JoshCo Tech, LLC
Defendant: Does 1-4, the owners and operators of vetbcg.com
Case Number: 2:2020cv00526
Filed: March 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. The Clerk's Office is INSTRUCTED to remove the restrictions on this #8 Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/28/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
April 28, 2020 Filing 8 EX PARTE MOTION for Leave to Serve Subpoenas by Plaintiff JoshCo Tech, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Meng Zhong, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order) (Kotchka-Alanes, Malani) Modified on 4/28/2020 (MMM).
April 28, 2020 Filing 7 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants by JoshCo Tech, LLC. No changes to parties. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Zhong, Meng)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Denying #3 Ex Parte Motion for Leave to Serve Subpoenas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/17/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) Modified on 3/19/2020 to remove restriction (MMM).
March 13, 2020 Filing 5 AO 121 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (JQC) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/13/2020: #1 Complaint) (JQC).
March 13, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Does 1-4, the owners and operators of vetbcg.com re #1 Complaint. (JQC)
March 13, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (JQC)
March 13, 2020 Filing 3 EX PARTE MOTION for Leave to Serve Subpoenas by Plaintiff JoshCo Tech, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Meng Zhong, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order) (Kotchka-Alanes, Malani)
March 13, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by JoshCo Tech, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent JoshCo Group, LLC for JoshCo Tech, LLC added. (Zhong, Meng)
March 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5926932) by JoshCo Tech, LLC. Proof of service due by 6/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (Zhong, Meng) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JoshCo Tech, LLC v. Does 1-4, the owners and operators of vetbcg.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-4, the owners and operators of vetbcg.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JoshCo Tech, LLC
Represented By: Malani Dale Kotchka-Alanes
Represented By: Meng Zhong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?