Bryant v Madison Management Services, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Lisa A. Bryant
Defendant: Madison Management Services, LLC and Porras, PLLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00594
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting 53 Stipulation; Discovery due by 12/8/2021. Motions due by 1/4/2022. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/3/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 7/15/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting 40 Stipulation to Extend Time. Discovery due by 8/5/2021. Motions due by 9/15/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/16/2021. Settlement conference shall be set by separate order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 2/25/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) Modified filed date on 2/26/2021 (DRS).
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 31 Motion to Extend Time to Answer 30 Amended Complaint. Madison Management Services, LLC answer due 12/17/2020; Waldman and Porras, PLLC answer due 12/17/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 12/3/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 28 Stipulation to Extend Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 4/5/2021. Motions due by 5/4/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/8/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 10/27/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 9 Motion to Dismiss and granting in part and denying in part 16 Motion for Leave to Amend. ; Amended Complaint deadline: 11/13/2020. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/23/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER - On or before 8/18/2020, Defendant shall submit either a notice in agreement with the 20 Proposed discovery plan and scheduling order or file it's own proposed discovery plan and scheduling order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 8/12/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER Denying 18 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order; Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 7/27/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 12 TIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) to File Response to: 9 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 7/2/2020. Replies due by 7/9/2020. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/3/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting 7 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to Answer 1 Complaint. Madison Management Services, LLC answer due 5/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 5/6/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryant v Madison Management Services, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madison Management Services, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas M Porras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Porras, PLLC
Represented By: Nicholas M Porras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa A. Bryant
Represented By: George Haines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?