Seeler et al v. Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: James L Babb, Barbara Harriet Seeler and The Estate of James L. Babb, Jr.
Defendant: Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00629
Filed: April 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 First STIPULATION and Order to Private Binding Arbitration. The case is Dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/1/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
May 1, 2020 Filing 9 First STIPULATION and Order to Private Binding Arbitration by Defendant Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. (Buckwalter, Bryce)
April 8, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Keating, John)
April 6, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 5/21/2020.(Keating, John) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company is ORDERED to show cause, in writing, as to why this action should not be remanded to the state court for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Failure to show cause by April 30, 2020 will result in remand to the state court. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/3/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
April 2, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Filer account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #1 . Attorneys Sandy Van and Tracee Duthie are advised to review and update their user account information. (no image attached) (EDS)
April 2, 2020 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorney Michael A. Direnzo is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to be admitted to practice and to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (EDS)
April 2, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
April 2, 2020 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/2/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 4/17/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 5/2/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
April 2, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (DRS)
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court Clark County, Case Number A-20-809962-C, (Filing fee $ 400) by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (DKJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seeler et al v. Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James L Babb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Harriet Seeler
Represented By: Tracee L Duthie
Represented By: Sandy Van
Represented By: Michael A. Direnzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Estate of James L. Babb, Jr.
Represented By: Tracee L Duthie
Represented By: Sandy Van
Represented By: Michael A. Direnzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Bryce B. Buckwalter
Represented By: John T. Keating
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?