Turiano v. Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company
Plaintiff: Dominique Turiano
Defendant: Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00641
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2020 Filing 11 Joint Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order re #10 Order by Defendant Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company. (Buckwalter, Bryce)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. The parties are hereby ORDERED to file a joint proposed discovery plan no later than 6/5/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/2/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
May 22, 2020 Filing 9 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company. (Buckwalter, Bryce)
April 16, 2020 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company. (Buckwalter, Bryce)
April 16, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 5/31/2020.(Buckwalter, Bryce) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
April 14, 2020 Filing 6 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company. (Buckwalter, Bryce)
April 8, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Dominique Turiano. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Roy, Eric)
April 6, 2020 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
April 6, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/6/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 4/21/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 5/6/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
April 6, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (JQC)
April 6, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Buckwalter, Bryce)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court, Case Number A-20-811679-c, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5954882) by Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Buckwalter, Bryce) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turiano v. Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company
Represented By: Bryce B. Buckwalter
Represented By: John T. Keating
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominique Turiano
Represented By: Eric P Roy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?