JoshCo Tech, LLC v. VA Rating Help, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: JoshCo Tech, LLC
Defendant: VA Rating Help, Inc. and Robert Jeffrey Johnston
Case Number: 2:2020cv00657
Filed: April 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Civil Case Terminated per #12 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (ADR)
May 26, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff JoshCo Tech, LLC. (Zhong, Meng)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Stipulation; Re: #8 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 5/26/2020. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/14/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 14, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #8 Motion to Dismiss,, by Plaintiff JoshCo Tech, LLC. (Zhong, Meng)
May 5, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Robert Jeffrey Johnston, VA Rating Help, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Borghese, Mark)
May 5, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Robert Jeffrey Johnston, VA Rating Help, Inc.. Responses due by 5/19/2020. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 6/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert J. Johnston, #2 Print out from esos.nv.gov) (Borghese, Mark) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
April 20, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JoshCo Tech, LLC re #3 Summons Issued, #5 AO 121 Copyright Report, #1 Complaint,, #2 Certificate of Interested Parties. Robert Jeffrey Johnston served on 4/14/2020. (Zhong, Meng)
April 20, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JoshCo Tech, LLC re #3 Summons Issued, #5 AO 121 Copyright Report, #1 Complaint,, #2 Certificate of Interested Parties. VA Rating Help, Inc. served on 4/14/2020. (Zhong, Meng)
April 9, 2020 Filing 5 AO 121 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (JM)
April 9, 2020 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 9, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (JM)
April 9, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (JM)
April 9, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by JoshCo Tech, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent JoshCo Group, LLC for JoshCo Tech, LLC added. (Zhong, Meng)
April 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5959681) by JoshCo Tech, LLC. Proof of service due by 7/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons VA Rating Help, Inc., #4 Summons Robert Johnston) (Zhong, Meng) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JoshCo Tech, LLC v. VA Rating Help, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VA Rating Help, Inc.
Represented By: Mark R. Borghese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Jeffrey Johnston
Represented By: Mark R. Borghese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JoshCo Tech, LLC
Represented By: Meng Zhong
Represented By: Malani Dale Kotchka-Alanes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?