Crawley v. Lombardo et al
Petitioner: Daine Anton Crawley
Respondent: Clark County Detention Center, Sheriff Joe Lombardo, Las Vegas Metro Police Department and Joe Lombardo
Case Number: 2:2020cv00660
Filed: April 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2020 Filing 6 CLERK'S JUDGMENT this action is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 6/2/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that #1 the application to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED as moot. IT FURTHER IS ORDERED that the clerk of the court file #1 -1 the petition for a writ of habeas corpus. IT FURTHER IS ORDERED that that the clerk shall add Aaron Ford, Attorney General for the State of Nevada, as counsel for respondents. IT FURTHER IS ORDERED that the clerk shall electronically serve upon respondents a copy of this order and the petition. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/1/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 29, 2020 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Attempted - Not Known re #2 Advisory Letter, addressed to Daine Anton Crawley. No new address available; Unable to remail. (MR)
April 17, 2020 Filing 3 Mail Returned as Attempted - Not Known re #2 Advisory Letter, addressed to Daine Anton Crawley. Remailed with updated ID number. (MR)
April 9, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE from USDC advising case against Sheriff Joe Lombardo, et al., has been received and assigned case number 2:20-cv-00660-JAD-EJY. (LW)
April 9, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Daine Anton Crawley. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus) (LW)
April 9, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (JQC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crawley v. Lombardo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Clark County Detention Center
Represented By: Aaron D. Ford-AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sheriff Joe Lombardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Las Vegas Metro Police Department
Represented By: Aaron D. Ford-AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Joe Lombardo
Represented By: Aaron D. Ford-AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Daine Anton Crawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?