James River Insurance Company v. Hilton et al
Plaintiff: James River Insurance Company
Defendant: Cory J Hilton, Law Office of Cory J. Hilton, Brian Gotti, Tomiko Barnes and Mountain Vista Law Group, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00687
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James River Insurance Company re #8 Proposed Summons to be issued, #1 Complaint,. Brian Gotti served on 5/23/2020. (Stephenson, Marsha)
June 1, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James River Insurance Company re #1 Complaint, #7 Proposed Summons to be issued. Tomiko Barnes served on 5/20/2020. (Stephenson, Marsha)
May 21, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James River Insurance Company re #1 Complaint, #6 Proposed Summons to be issued. Mountain Vista Law Group, LLC served on 5/19/2020. (Stephenson, Marsha)
May 21, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James River Insurance Company re #5 Proposed Summons to be issued, #1 Complaint,. Law Offices of Cory J. Hilton served on 5/19/2020. (Stephenson, Marsha)
May 21, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James River Insurance Company re #4 Proposed Summons to be issued, #1 Complaint,. Cory J Hilton served on 5/19/2020. (Stephenson, Marsha)
May 14, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (JM)
May 14, 2020 Filing 8 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued regarding Brian Gotti by Plaintiff James River Insurance Company. (Stephenson, Marsha)
May 14, 2020 Filing 7 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued regarding Tomiko Barnes by Plaintiff James River Insurance Company. (Stephenson, Marsha)
May 14, 2020 Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued regarding Mountain Vista Law Group by Plaintiff James River Insurance Company. (Stephenson, Marsha)
May 14, 2020 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued regarding Law Offices of Cory J. Hilton by Plaintiff James River Insurance Company. (Stephenson, Marsha)
May 14, 2020 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued regarding Cory J. Hilton by Plaintiff James River Insurance Company. (Stephenson, Marsha)
April 16, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by James River Insurance Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Stephenson, Marsha)
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 16, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (JM)
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5968302) by James River Insurance Company. Proof of service due by 7/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Stephenson, Marsha) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James River Insurance Company v. Hilton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cory J Hilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Office of Cory J. Hilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Gotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tomiko Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mountain Vista Law Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James River Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?