DArienzo v. Neubloc, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kristine DArienzo and Kristine D'Arienzo
Defendant: Neubloc, LLC, Avie Holdings, LLC, Tributary Publishing, Inc., Teqniksoft, LLC and Teqspring, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00689
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint & Affirmative Defenses filed by Avie Holdings, LLC, Neubloc, LLC, Teqniksoft, LLC, Teqspring, Inc., Tributary Publishing, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 7/13/2020.(Gronich, Jeffrey) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
May 29, 2020 Filing 19 COUNTERCLAIM against Kristine D'Arienzo by Neubloc, LLC, Tributary Publishing, Inc.. (Gronich, Jeffrey)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REGARDING IN-PERSON SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. The confidential settlement conference statement, with exhibits, must be delivered electronically to Emily_Santiago@nvd.uscourts.gov by 4:00 p.m. 6/15/2020. The Settlement Conference is set for 7/28/2020 before Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. Plaintiff must report to the chambers of the undersigned United States Magistrate Judge, Room 4068, at 9:00 a.m. Defendants must report to the chambers of the undersigned at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 5/14/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO PLACE THIS MATTER INTO EARLY NEUTRAL EVALUATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 5/14/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
May 13, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Kristine D'Arienzo. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Perry, Alexander)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO PLACE THIS MATTER INTO EARLY NEUTRAL EVALUATION by Defendant Neubloc, LLC. (Gronich, Jeffrey)
May 12, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (EDS)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER granting #12 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 10/12/2020. Motions due by 11/11/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/11/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 5/12/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
May 11, 2020 Filing 12 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant Neubloc, LLC. (Gronich, Jeffrey)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Denying as moot #9 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/11/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
May 8, 2020 Filing 10 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Kristine D'Arienzo. No changes to parties. (Perry, Alexander)
April 27, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Avie Holdings, LLC, Neubloc, LLC, Teqniksoft, LLC, Teqspring, Inc., Tributary Publishing, Inc.. Responses due by 5/11/2020. (Gronich, Jeffrey)
April 23, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S LIEN by Kristine D'Arienzo. (Hutchings, Mark)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Mark Hutchings terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 4/20/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
April 20, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Alexander M. P. Perry in for Attorney Mark H. Hutchings by Plaintiff Kristine D'Arienzo. (Perry, Alexander)
April 16, 2020 Filing 5 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Avie Holdings, LLC, Neubloc, LLC, Teqniksoft, LLC, Teqspring, Inc., Tributary Publishing, Inc.. (Gronich, Jeffrey)
April 16, 2020 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
April 16, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/16/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 5/1/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 5/16/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
April 16, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (DRS)
April 15, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Avie Holdings, LLC, Neubloc, LLC, Teqniksoft, LLC, Teqspring, Inc., Tributary Publishing, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Gronich, Jeffrey)
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-20-812-123-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5968024) by Teqspring, Inc., Avie Holdings, LLC, Neubloc, LLC, Teqniksoft, LLC, Tributary Publishing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Gronich, Jeffrey) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DArienzo v. Neubloc, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristine DArienzo
Represented By: Mark Hutchings
Represented By: Alexander M. P. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristine D'Arienzo
Represented By: Alexander M. P. Perry
Represented By: Mark Hutchings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neubloc, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Gronich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avie Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Gronich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tributary Publishing, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Gronich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teqniksoft, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Gronich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teqspring, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Gronich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?