Ben Geno et al v. Wolf et al
Plaintiff: Liron Ben Geno and Flor Estevez
Defendant: Chad F Wolf, US Citizenship and Immigration Services, Mark Koumans, Department of Homeland Security and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2020cv00719
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: James C Mahan
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08:1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to File Answer to Plaintiff's #2 Complaint. Federal Defendants answer due 8/12/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 6/10/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
June 9, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint re #2 Complaint,, by Defendant United States of America. (Irvin, Brian)
April 23, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Mark Koumans, US Citizenship and Immigration Services, Chad F Wolf re #2 Complaint. Summons also issued as to US Attorney General, US Attorney's Office/District of Nevada. (DRS)
April 22, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Liron Ben Geno, Flor Estevez. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Snavely, Luther)
April 22, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (DRS)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Department of Homeland Security, Mark Koumans, US Citizenship and Immigration Services, Chad F Wolf (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5977106) by Liron Ben Geno, Flor Estevez. Proof of service due by 7/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons) (Snavely, Luther) Modified on 4/22/2020 - removed US Attorney General, party not listed in complaint nor caption of complaint. (DRS). NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Writ of Mandamus by Plaintiffs Liron Ben Geno, Flor Estevez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons) (Snavely, Luther)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ben Geno et al v. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad F Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Koumans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Brian W. Irvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liron Ben Geno
Represented By: Luther M Snavely, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flor Estevez
Represented By: Luther M Snavely, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?