P&L Sales Group Inc. v. Twisted Brands LLC et al
Plaintiff: P&L Sales Group Inc.
Defendant: Twisted Brands LLC, Scot Greve, Colin Episcopo and Cheryl Natlo
Case Number: 2:2020cv00810
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by P&L Sales Group Inc. re #7 Summons Issued. Twisted Brands LLC served on 6/18/2020. (Bayramoglu, Nihat)
June 22, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by P&L Sales Group Inc. re #7 Summons Issued. Cheryl Natlo served on 6/22/2020. 6/18/2020 (Bayramoglu, Nihat) Modified on 6/22/2020 to correct date served (DKJ).
June 2, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (MR)
June 2, 2020 Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued as to each Defendant by Plaintiff P&L Sales Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Natlo proposed summons, #2 Greve proposed summons, #3 Episcopo proposed summons) (Bayramoglu, Nihat)
May 6, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by P&L Sales Group Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Bayramoglu, Nihat)
May 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to #1 Complaint. ERROR: Certificate of Interested Parties should be docketed as a separate entry and not attached to the complaint. Attorney Nihat Deniz Bayramoglu advised to file the certificate of interested parties as a separate entry selecting the "Certificate of Interested Parties" event located under the "Commencement of an Action, Etc." category. (no image attached) (DKJ)
May 5, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 5, 2020 Filing 2 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (MR)
May 5, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (MR)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5992919) by P&L Sales Group Inc.. Proof of service due by 8/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Certificate of Interested Parties, #5 AO 120) (Bayramoglu, Nihat) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: P&L Sales Group Inc. v. Twisted Brands LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P&L Sales Group Inc.
Represented By: Nihat Deniz Bayramoglu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twisted Brands LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scot Greve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colin Episcopo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Natlo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?