Perez v. United States of America, et al.
Petitioner: Daniel Martinez Perez
Respondent: Chad F Wolf, Kerri Ann Quihuis, United States of America, Jeanne M. Kent and William Barr
Case Number: 2:2020cv00813
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: James C Mahan
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to #10 Motion, by Respondents William Barr, Jeanne M. Kent, Kerri Ann Quihuis, United States of America, Chad F Wolf. (Irvin, Brian)
June 25, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Daniel Martinez Perez. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Gonzales, Xavier)
June 18, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #10 Motion, by Petitioner Daniel Martinez Perez. Replies due by 6/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4) (Gonzales, Xavier)
June 5, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Respondent United States of America. Responses due by 6/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Index Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit "A" Notice to Appear, #3 Exhibit "B" Order Denying Bond and Memorandum Decision, #4 Exhibit "C" BIA Decision on Bond, #5 Exhibit "D" Order on Removal) (Irvin, Brian)
June 4, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT 7018 2290 0001 8797 2285 re #4 Order, #2 Summons Issued as to USA, #1 Complaint. (ADR)
May 21, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT 7018 2290 0001 8797 2278 re #4 Order, #2 Summons Issued as to USA, #1 Complaint. (ADR)
May 20, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed re #1 Complaint. United States of America served on 5/19/2020. (ADR)
May 19, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT 7018 2290 0001 8797 2308 re #4 Order, #2 Summons Issued as to USA, #1 Complaint. (ADR)
May 13, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPTS 7018 2290 0001 8797 2285, 7018 2290 0001 8797 2278, 7018 2290 0001 8797 2292, 7018 2290 0001 8797 2308 re #4 Order, #2 Summons Issued as to USA, #1 Complaint. (ADR)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to ISSUE SUMMONSES to respondents and deliver the same to the United States Marshal for service along with a copy of #1 the petition and this order. The Clerk of Court shall SEND VIA REGISTERED OR CERTIFIED MAIL a copy of the petition, this order, and summons for the particular respondent. See Order for further specifications. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/13/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: USM - ADR)
May 6, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Daniel Martinez Perez. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Gonzales, Xavier)
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to William Barr, Jeanne M. Kent, Kerri Ann Quihuis, United States of America, Chad F Wolf, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General re #1 Complaint. (ADR)
May 6, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (ADR)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against William Barr, Jeanne M. Kent, Kerri Ann Quihuis, United States of America, Chad F Wolf (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5994160) by DANIEL MARTINEZ PEREZ. Proof of service due by 8/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons) (Gonzales, Xavier) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified on 6/8/2020 to change event from Complaint to Petition (SLD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. United States of America, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad F Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kerri Ann Quihuis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeanne M. Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Daniel Martinez Perez
Represented By: Xavier Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?