Restivo v. Union Pacific Railroad Company et al
Plaintiff: James Restivo
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company and Lhoist North America, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00820
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (MR)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #16 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 2/18/2021. Motions due by 3/19/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/16/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/30/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 29, 2020 Filing 16 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff James Restivo. (Day, Steven)
June 5, 2020 Filing 15 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Calvert, Lauren)
May 15, 2020 Filing 14 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Calvert, Lauren)
May 15, 2020 Filing 13 ERROR NOTICE to counsel re filing of #11 Certificate of Interested Parties,. All interested parties were not properly entered on the docket. Attorney Howard Russell advised that in the future, Certificates of Interested Parties filed with the District of Nevada shall be filed in accordance with FRCP 7.1 and LR 7.1-1, and shall enter on the docket all persons, associations of person, firms, partnerships or corporations (including parent corporations) which have a direct pecuniary interest in the outcome of the case. (no image attached) (DKJ)
May 15, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company.(Calvert, Lauren)
May 14, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Lhoist North America of Arizona, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case Corporate Parent Lhoist North America, Inc. added (Russell, Howard) Modified on 5/15/2020 to add corporate parent (DKJ).
May 14, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal,, filed by Lhoist North America of Arizona, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 6/28/2020.(Russell, Howard) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting #8 Stipulation to Amend Caption and Extend Time (First Request). Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/12/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 12, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION to Amend Caption and to Extend Time For Properly Captioned Party to Answer (First Request) by Defendant Lhoist North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Llewellyn, Brittany)
May 7, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by James Restivo. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Day, Steven)
May 7, 2020 Filing 6 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 7, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/7/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 5/22/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 6/6/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 6, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (MR)
May 6, 2020 Filing 4 Amended STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Calvert, Lauren)
May 6, 2020 Filing 3 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Calvert, Lauren)
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Union Pacific Railroad Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Calvert, Lauren)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District, Clark County, Case Number A-20-813626-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5994966) by Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2, #4 Exhibit Ex. 3) (Calvert, Lauren) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Restivo v. Union Pacific Railroad Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Lauren Dee Calvert
Represented By: Renee M Finch
Represented By: Melissa Ann Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lhoist North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Restivo
Represented By: Steven L. Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?