Desert Land Loan Acquisition, LLC et al v. Shapiro et al
Appellant: Howard Bulloch, Cristi Bulloch and Desert Land Loan Acquisition, LLC
Appellee: Compass Investments, LLC, Citation Financial LLC, Brian Shapiro, Kavita Gupta, Trustee, Shotgun Creek Las Vegas, LLC, Bradley J Busbin and The Sher Group
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Interested Party: Juniper Loan Servicing Corporation
Case Number: 2:2020cv00844
Filed: May 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Bankruptcy Appeal by Appellants Cristi Bulloch, Howard Bulloch, Desert Land Loan Acquisition, LLC, In Re Desert Land Loan Acquisition, LLC. Responses due by 7/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (O'Steen, Tracy)
June 23, 2020 Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 6/23/2020. IT IS ORDERED that the appellant shall have a period of 14 days from the date of this order to file/serve an opening brief. Appellee shall have 14 days after to file/serve an answering brief. Thereafter, appellant shall have 14 days to file/serve a final reply brief. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall file and serve excerpts of the record as an appendix to the appellant brief pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009(b) and LR IC 2-2. Appellee may also file/serve an appendix with appellee brief which contains required material omitted by appellant. Opening brief due by 7/7/2020. Answering brief due by 7/21/2020. Reply brief due by 8/4/2020. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
June 22, 2020 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE of Readiness. (DRS) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/23/2020: #1 Appellant Statement of Issues, #2 Appellant Designation of Record, #3 Appellee Designation of Record) (AF). Modified on 6/23/2020 to include Statement of Issues and Designation of Record. (AF).
May 18, 2020 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #1 Bankruptcy Appeal by Appellants Cristi Bulloch, Howard Bulloch, Desert Land Loan Acquisition, LLC, In Re Desert Land Loan Acquisition, LLC. (O'Steen, Tracy)
May 18, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #1 Bankruptcy Appeal by Appellants Cristi Bulloch, Howard Bulloch, Desert Land Loan Acquisition, LLC, In Re Desert Land Loan Acquisition, LLC. (O'Steen, Tracy)
May 18, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for 3 Ex Parte Motion, by Appellants Cristi Bulloch, Howard Bulloch, Desert Land Loan Acquisition, LLC, In Re Desert Land Loan Acquisition, LLC. (O'Steen, Tracy)
May 11, 2020 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 5/11/2020. IT IS ORDERED that the designation of reporters and recorders transcripts (if any) as required by Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009(a) shall be filed with the clerk of bankruptcy court so the certificate of readiness may be transmitted timely to the district court. If the designation was previously filed with the clerk of BAP, counsel shall file a copy of the same with the clerk of bankruptcy court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all future documents filed in connection with this appeal shall bear the bankruptcy case number, adversary case number (if any) and the district court civil case number. For Bankruptcy Appeals, Attorneys are required to file Verified Petitions in accordance with LR IA 11-2. Verified Petition due by 6/25/2020. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
May 11, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT, Bankruptcy Court case number 18-12454-gs. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal, #2 Appeal Memorandum, #3 Documents) (DRS) (Attachment 3 replaced on 5/12/2020) (DRS).
May 11, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan. (DRS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Desert Land Loan Acquisition, LLC et al v. Shapiro et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Howard Bulloch
Represented By: Candace C. Carlyon
Represented By: Tracy O'Steen
Represented By: Dawn M Cica
Represented By: Dawn M. Cica
Represented By: Tracy M O'Steen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Cristi Bulloch
Represented By: Candace C. Carlyon
Represented By: Tracy O'Steen
Represented By: Dawn M Cica
Represented By: Dawn M. Cica
Represented By: Tracy M O'Steen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Desert Land Loan Acquisition, LLC
Represented By: Candace C. Carlyon
Represented By: Dawn M Cica
Represented By: Dawn M. Cica
Represented By: Tracy M O'Steen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Compass Investments, LLC
Represented By: Bart K Larsen
Represented By: James Patrick Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Citation Financial LLC
Represented By: Bart K Larsen
Represented By: James Patrick Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Brian Shapiro
Represented By: Brian D Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Kavita Gupta, Trustee
Represented By: Kimberly Fineman
Represented By: Talitha B Gray
Represented By: Christopher H Hart
Represented By: Dylan T. Ciciliano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Shotgun Creek Las Vegas, LLC
Represented By: Douglas D. Gerrard
Represented By: Brigid Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Bradley J Busbin
Represented By: Jamie P. Dreher
Represented By: Mark D Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: The Sher Group
Represented By: Michael N Feder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Represented By: Edward M. McDonald, Jr
Represented By: U.S. Trustee, Las Vegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Juniper Loan Servicing Corporation
Represented By: Justin Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?