Merced et al v. Nevada Property 1, LLC
Plaintiff: Deon Merced and Sertha Evans
Defendant: Nevada Property 1, LLC and Nevada Property 1, LLC doing business as The Cosmopolitan Las Vegas
Case Number: 2:2020cv00920
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #7 Stipulation to Extend Time re #1 Complaint (First Request). Nevada Property 1, LLC answer due 8/17/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/1/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 1, 2020 Filing 7 First STIPULATION To Extend Time For Defendant To File A Response To Plaintiffs Complaint re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Nevada Property 1, LLC. (McClane, Lisa)
June 19, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deon Merced, Sertha Evans re #3 Summons Issued. Nevada Property 1, LLC served on 6/11/2020. (Mott, Joseph)
May 21, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Sertha Evans, Deon Merced. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Mott, Joseph)
May 21, 2020 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 21, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Nevada Property 1, LLC re #1 Complaint. (MR)
May 21, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (MR)
May 21, 2020 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Nevada Property 1, LLC d/b/a The Cosmopolitan Las Vegas by Plaintiffs Sertha Evans, Deon Merced. (Mott, Joseph)
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nevada Property 1, LLC d/b/a The Cosmopolitan Las Vegas (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6013603) by Deon Merced, Sertha Evans. Proof of service due by 8/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Mott, Joseph) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merced et al v. Nevada Property 1, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deon Merced
Represented By: Danielle J. Barraza
Represented By: Joseph Nathan Mott
Represented By: Joseph A. Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sertha Evans
Represented By: Danielle J. Barraza
Represented By: Joseph Nathan Mott
Represented By: Joseph A. Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Property 1, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Property 1, LLC doing business as The Cosmopolitan Las Vegas
Represented By: Daniel Aquino
Represented By: Lisa A McClane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?