Martinez v. Wild Cherry Trucking, Inc. et al
Case Number: 2:2020cv00984
Filed: June 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Auto Negligence
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2020 Filing 11 Intradistrict Transfer to Northern Division. (no image attached) (DRS)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Transferring Case to Unofficial Northern Division. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/29/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
June 25, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #5 Order to Show Cause by Defendants James Stuart Dunnington, Wild Cherry Trucking, Inc.. (Aicklen, Josh)
June 17, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by James Stuart Dunnington, Wild Cherry Trucking, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Aicklen, Josh)
June 17, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint filed by James Stuart Dunnington, Wild Cherry Trucking, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/1/2020.(Aicklen, Josh) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
June 17, 2020 Filing 6 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants James Stuart Dunnington, Wild Cherry Trucking, Inc.. (Aicklen, Josh)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Whether or Not this Case Should Transfer to the Court's Northern Division. Show Cause Response due by 6/26/2020. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/2/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
June 2, 2020 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
June 2, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/2/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 6/17/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 7/2/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
June 1, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (DRS)
June 1, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by James Stuart Dunnington, Wild Cherry Trucking, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Aicklen, Josh)
June 1, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from 8th Judicial District of Nevada, County of Clark, Case Number A-20-813388-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-6025021) by James Stuart Dunnington, Wild Cherry Trucking, Inc. Proof of service due by 7/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Summons, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Affidavits of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Aicklen, Josh) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Wild Cherry Trucking, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?