Brewer v. Johnson et al
Petitioner: Arthur J Brewer
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General and Calvin Johnson
Case Number: 2:2020cv00991
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Kent J Dawson
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Petitioner Arthur J Brewer. (KR)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that #4 Brewers Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. Brewer must file a complete application to proceed in forma pauperis (IFP) by 8/24/2020. See Order for Details. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 7/16/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
July 14, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Extend Time re ECF No. #3 Order, by Petitioner Arthur J Brewer. (AB)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that #1 Petitioner Arthur J. Brewer's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The initial screening of Brewers Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (ECF No. 1-1) under the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases and consideration of his Motion for Appointment of Counsel (ECF No. 1-2) are deferred until such time as he has fully complied with this order. Brewer must file a complete IFP application by 7/24/2020. Alternatively, Brewer must pay the $5.00 filing fee by 7/24/2020. See Order for Details. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 6/10/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - prisoner IFP instructions/form mailed to Plaintiff - JQC)
June 5, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (DKJ)
June 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE from USDC advising case against Calvin Johnson, et al., has been received and assigned case number 2:20-cv-00991. (DRM)
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Arthur J Brewer. (Attachments: #1 Petition for WHC, #2 Motion for Counsel) (DRM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brewer v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Arthur J Brewer
Represented By: HDSP Law Library
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Calvin Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?