Burris v. First Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: John Scott Burris
Defendant: First Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00999
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Scott Burris. First Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company waiver sent on 6/4/2020, answer due 8/3/2020. (Leverty, Patrick)
June 4, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to First Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company re #1 Complaint. (ADR)
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 3, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (ADR)
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by John Scott Burris that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (Leverty, Patrick)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against First Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6028500) by John Scott Burris. Proof of service due by 9/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons First Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company) (Leverty, Patrick) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burris v. First Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Scott Burris
Represented By: Patrick R. Leverty
Represented By: William Ginn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?