TRP Fund VIII, LLC v. NewRez, LLC
Plaintiff: TRP Fund VIII, LLC
Defendant: NewRez, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01001
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to #15 Motion to Dismiss,,, by Defendant NewRez, LLC. (Vesterdahl, Matthew)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting #19 Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: #15 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS ORDERED, that Defendant shall have until 7/23/2020 to file a Reply brief to Plaintiff's Response in opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/10/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
July 10, 2020 Filing 19 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re #18 Response as to #15 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant NewRez, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Vesterdahl, Matthew)
July 9, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE to #15 Motion to Dismiss,,, by Plaintiff TRP Fund VIII, LLC. Replies due by 7/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 1, #2 Exhibit Exh 2, #3 Exhibit Exh 3, #4 Exhibit Exh 4) (Wright, John)
July 7, 2020 Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 7/7/2020. The Court has reviewed the parties' joint status report at ECF No. #16 . The parties are instructed that if they would like the Court to consider a stay of discovery, the proper vehicle is a stipulation and order. The Court will take no further action on ECF No. #16 at this time. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DCh)
July 2, 2020 Filing 16 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant NewRez, LLC. (Vesterdahl, Matthew)
June 25, 2020 Filing 15 First MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant NewRez, LLC. Responses due by 7/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deed of Trust 8.7.06, #2 Exhibit B - Assignment of Deed of Trust 2.19.10, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Default 2.22.10, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Delinquent Assessment Lien 4.25.11, #5 Exhibit E - Notice of Default and Election to Sell under HOA line 6.30.11, #6 Exhibit F - Rescission of Notice of Default 9.6.12, #7 Exhibit G - Assignment of Deed of Trust - 7.2.13, #8 Exhibit H - Notice of Foreclosure under HOA Line 7.1.13, #9 Exhibit I - Foreclosure Deed 8.30.13, #10 Exhibit J - Quitclaim Deed 1.23.18, #11 Exhibit K - Quitclaim Deed 4.13.18, #12 Exhibit L - Corporate Assignment of Deed of Trust 2.25.20, #13 Exhibit M - Assignment of Deed of Trust 4.17.20, #14 Exhibit N - Court of Appeal Order, #15 Exhibit O - Notice of Entry of Judgment) (Vesterdahl, Matthew)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that #6 the order to show cause is deemed satisfied and I will not remand this matter for lack of subject matter jurisdiction at this time. However, defendant NewRez, LLC remains responsible for establishing that subject matter jurisdiction exists before judgment is entered in this case. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/24/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
June 19, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #6 Order to Show Cause, by Defendant NewRez, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Nevada Secretary of State Information Regarding TRP Fund VIII, LLC, #2 Exhibit B - California Secretary of State Information Regarding TRP Fund VIII, LLC) (Vesterdahl, Matthew)
June 19, 2020 Filing 12 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant NewRez, LLC. (Vesterdahl, Matthew)
June 19, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by NewRez, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Shellpoint Partners LLC, Other Affiliate NRM Acquisition LLC, Other Affiliate NRM Acquisition II LLC, Other Affiliate New Residential Mortgage LLC, Other Affiliate New Residential Mortgage LLC for NewRez, LLC added. (Vesterdahl, Matthew)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #9 Stipulation for Extension of Time. NewRez, LLC answer due 6/25/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 6/11/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
June 10, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) for Defendant to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant NewRez, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Vesterdahl, Matthew)
June 10, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #2 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendant NewRez, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Court's 6.5.20 Minute Order) (Vesterdahl, Matthew)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that #5 is DENIED without prejudice. The parties may refile their stipulation explaining what good cause exists for the court to grant the extension. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 6/9/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. IT IS ORDERED that by 6/30/2020, defendant NewRez, LLC shall show cause, in writing, why this action should not be remanded for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Failure to respond by that date will result in this case being remanded to state court. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/9/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
June 8, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) and Order for Defendant NewRez, LLC to file a Reponse to Plaintiff's Complaint to June 25, 2020, by Defendant NewRez, LLC. (Vesterdahl, Matthew)
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Association of Counsel by Matthew S. Vesterdahl on behalf of Defendant NewRez, LLC. (Vesterdahl, Matthew)
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/5/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 6/20/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 7/5/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
June 5, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (JQC)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 First PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Clark County District Court, Case Number A-20-814235-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-6030375) by NewRez, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint filed in Clark County District Court, #2 Exhibit B - Deed of Trust, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bao, Andrew) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TRP Fund VIII, LLC v. NewRez, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NewRez, LLC
Represented By: Andrew A. Bao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRP Fund VIII, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?