January 18, 2023 |
Filing
71
ORDER denying without prejudice 53 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. ORDER granting 69 Motion to Stay Case; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this action, until such time as the court grants a motion to reopen the matter. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/18/2023. Case terminated. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
|
December 21, 2022 |
Filing
66
ORDER Granting 65 Motion to Extend Time to file reply to 53 Motion for Leave to File Document. Replies due by 12/27/2022. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/21/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
|
December 6, 2022 |
Filing
64
ORDER granting 63 Motion to Extend Time Re: 53 Motion for Leave to to amend the petition. Replies due by 12/19/2022. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/6/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
|
November 4, 2022 |
Filing
62
ORDER granting 61 Motion to Extend Time Re: 60 Response to 53 Motion for Leave to File. Replies due by 12/5/2022. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/4/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
|
September 7, 2022 |
Filing
57
ORDER granting 56 Motion to Extend Time Re: 53 Motion for Leave to File Document, Responses due by 10/7/2022. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/7/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
|
August 8, 2022 |
Filing
55
ORDER granting 54 Motion to Extend Time Re: 53 Motion for Leave to amend the petition, Responses due by 9/7/2022. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/7/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
|
June 27, 2022 |
Filing
51
ORDER granting 49 Motion to Extend Time. The deadline to file a motion for leave to file a third-amended petition for writ of habeas corpus is July 25, 2022. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/27/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
|
May 13, 2022 |
Filing
48
ORDER granting 47 Motion to Extend Time; The deadline to file the motion to dismiss is June 27, 2022. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/13/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
|
March 29, 2022 |
Filing
46
ORDER granting 45 Motion to Extend Time. Motion to Dismiss due by 5/12/2022. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/29/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
|
February 24, 2022 |
Filing
44
ORDER denying without prejudice 29 Motion to Dismiss. ORDER granting 39 Motion for more definite statement. ORDER granting 25 Motion; Discovery must be completed within 90 days from the date of entry of this order. Petitioner will have 30 days from the completion of discovery to file and serve any appropriate motion. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/24/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
|
April 20, 2021 |
Filing
28
ORDER granting 27 Motion to Extend Time to Respond. Respondents have up to an including 6/4/2021 to Respond re: 23 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/20/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
|
February 11, 2021 |
Filing
22
ORDER granting 21 Motion to Extend Time; Second Amended Petition due by 2/19/2021. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/11/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
|
February 4, 2021 |
Filing
20
ORDER granting 19 Motion to Extend Time; Amended Petition due by 2/10/2021. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/4/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
|
January 4, 2021 |
Filing
18
ORDER granting 17 Motion to Extend Time; Amended Petition due by 2/3/2021. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/4/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
|
November 4, 2020 |
Filing
16
ORDER granting 15 Motion to Extend Time; Second Amended Petition due by 1/4/2021. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/4/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
|
July 8, 2020 |
Filing
12
ORDER granting 9 Motion for Leave to File Document; ORDER granting 10 Motion for Scheduling Order; Petitioner must file first amended protective petition within 7 days of entry of this order. Petitioner will have until up to and including 120 days from entry of this order to file a Second Amended Petition (see order for deadlines). Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/8/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
June 10, 2020 |
Filing
3
ORDER Denying 1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The petitioner will have 30 days from entry of this order within which to have the filing fee of $5.00 sent to the clerk of court. IT FURTHER IS ORDERED that the clerk f ile the petition, the exhibits to the petition, the motion for appointment of counsel, and the motion for leave to file additional grounds, currently in the docket at ECF No. 1-1 through 1-4. IT FURTHER IS ORDERED that petitioner's motion for appointment of counsel is provisionally GRANTED. IT FURTHER IS ORDERED that the motion for leave to file additional grounds is GRANTED. See Order for further specifications. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/10/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Petitioner, Nevada Attorney General, FPD; Encl. to P: 2 copies of Order - ADR)
|