Henrickson v. State of Nevada et al
Case Number: 2:2020cv01014
Filed: September 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Granting 72 Motion to Strike and Striking 71 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 2/24/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Granting 45 Motion for Leave to Supplement, Denying 46 Motion to Consolidate Cases without prejudice, Denying 48 Motion to Stay Case, Granting 52 Motion to File a Response, Denying 54 Motion to File Documents, and finally, Denying 55 Motion to Grant P.I. based on lack of response. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/2/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER denying 28 plaintiff Trent Henrickson's motion for submission; ORDER granting 21 Motion for Leave to File Motion and 31 Motion for Leave to File Supplement. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/6/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Denying 26 Motion for Defendants' Counsel to be Responsible to Effectuate an Early Case Conference; Denying 30 Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel and Denying 33 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Ex Parte Motion. The Court Further Sets Discovery Plan Deadlines. Discovery due by 3/29/2021. Motions due by 4/28/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/28/2021. See Order for additional detail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 12/28/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Setting Deadlines - Defendants have 20 days from acceptance of service to Respond to 21 Motion for Leave to File Document and 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/17/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is allowed to proceed without prepayment of filing fees. A copy of this order shall be forwarded to Inmate Services for payment information.The Clerk is directed to serve a copy of the 14 Complaint and this order electronically upon the Attorney General's Office for the State of Nevada. The AG's office shall file notice with the court regarding representation and service as outlined in the order by 1/4/2021. Proof of service due by 3/14/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 12/14/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF cc: Nevada Attorney General and Chief of Inmate Services NDOC - DRS)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 19 Notice of non-receipt and Request for same Re: 17 Order Setting Inmate Early Mediation Conference. The Clerk is directed to mail plaintiff a copy of the Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 9/25/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - copy mailed to P this date and NEF of 17 regenerated - DRS)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER EXTENDING STAY. See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 9/22/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henrickson v. State of Nevada et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?