May 13, 2021 |
Filing
113
ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 103 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 5/13/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
|
May 10, 2021 |
Filing
109
ORDER granting 108 Motion to Extend Time; Defendants are granted through May 17, 2021, to prepare and serve a privilege log on Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 5/10/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
|
April 19, 2021 |
Filing
101
ORDER denying 97 Motion for Submission for Rulings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 4/19/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
|
April 15, 2021 |
Filing
96
ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 64 and 68 Motions to Compel. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties are to meet and confer within 30 days of the date of this Order regarding Requests for Production Nos. 1, 2, 4, 6, 8, and 12. Additional Details/Deadlines included in Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 4/15/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
|
April 12, 2021 |
Filing
95
ORDER Denying 93 Motion to Stay Case pending Appeal. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/12/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
|
March 23, 2021 |
Filing
87
ORDER Granting 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/23/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
March 15, 2021 |
Filing
83
ORDER to Produce Inmate Trent Henrickson for 3/22/2021 hearing at 1:00 pm. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/15/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; cc: USMS - DRS)
|
March 12, 2021 |
Filing
82
ORDER SETTING HEARING ON 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction AND 34 and 29 Motions for Reconsideration. Motion Hearing set for 3/22/2021 at 01:00 PM by videoconference before Judge Andrew P. Gordon. The courtroom administrator will provide counsel and High Desert State Prison with the link to attend the video conference. Please contact the courtroom administrator Melissa Johansen at Melissa_Johansen@nvd.uscourts.gov. Members of the public seeking to have access to this hearing must, prior to the day of the hearing, contact the courtroom administrator by email to request access to this hearing. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/12/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
|
March 8, 2021 |
Filing
81
ORDER granting 77 Motion to Extend Discovery. Discovery due by 6/7/2021. Motions due by 7/7/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/6/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 3/8/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
|
February 24, 2021 |
Filing
73
ORDER Granting 72 Motion to Strike and Striking 71 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 2/24/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
|
February 2, 2021 |
Filing
58
ORDER Granting 45 Motion for Leave to Supplement, Denying 46 Motion to Consolidate Cases without prejudice, Denying 48 Motion to Stay Case, Granting 52 Motion to File a Response, Denying 54 Motion to File Documents, and finally, Denying 55 Motion to Grant P.I. based on lack of response. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/2/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
|
January 6, 2021 |
Filing
43
ORDER denying 28 plaintiff Trent Henrickson's motion for submission; ORDER granting 21 Motion for Leave to File Motion and 31 Motion for Leave to File Supplement. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/6/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
|
December 28, 2020 |
Filing
36
ORDER Denying 26 Motion for Defendants' Counsel to be Responsible to Effectuate an Early Case Conference; Denying 30 Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel and Denying 33 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Ex Parte Motion. The Court Further Sets Discovery Plan Deadlines. Discovery due by 3/29/2021. Motions due by 4/28/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/28/2021. See Order for additional detail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 12/28/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
|
December 17, 2020 |
Filing
27
ORDER Setting Deadlines - Defendants have 20 days from acceptance of service to Respond to 21 Motion for Leave to File Document and 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/17/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
|
December 14, 2020 |
Filing
23
ORDER granting 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is allowed to proceed without prepayment of filing fees. A copy of this order shall be forwarded to Inmate Services for payment information.The Clerk is directed to serve a copy of the 14 Complaint and this order electronically upon the Attorney General's Office for the State of Nevada. The AG's office shall file notice with the court regarding representation and service as outlined in the order by 1/4/2021. Proof of service due by 3/14/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 12/14/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF cc: Nevada Attorney General and Chief of Inmate Services NDOC - DRS)
|
September 25, 2020 |
Filing
20
ORDER granting 19 Notice of non-receipt and Request for same Re: 17 Order Setting Inmate Early Mediation Conference. The Clerk is directed to mail plaintiff a copy of the Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 9/25/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - copy mailed to P this date and NEF of 17 regenerated - DRS)
|
September 22, 2020 |
Filing
18
ORDER EXTENDING STAY. See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 9/22/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|