Egorov v. Chad Wolf, et al
Plaintiff: Alexander Alexandrovich Egorov
Defendant: Chad Wolf, US Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States of America and Mark Koumans
Case Number: 2:2020cv01026
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #4 Motion to Stay Case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/27/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
July 23, 2020 Filing 4 Joint MOTION to Stay Case by Defendants Mark Koumans, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, US Department of Homeland Security, United States of America, Chad Wolf. (Pearson, Skyler)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Mark Koumans, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, US Department of Homeland Security, United States of America, Chad Wolf re #1 Complaint. (JQC)
June 11, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (JQC)
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Alexander Alexandrovich Egorov. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Snavely, Luther)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6037345) by Alexander Alexandrovich Egorov. Proof of service due by 9/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons) (Snavely, Luther) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified on 6/10/2020 (MMM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Egorov v. Chad Wolf, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Skyler Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Skyler Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Skyler Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Skyler Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Koumans
Represented By: Skyler Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Alexandrovich Egorov
Represented By: Luther M Snavely, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?