Hurricane Electric LLC v. Millennium Funding, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Hurricane Electric LLC
Defendant: Criminal Productions, Inc., Survivor Productions, Inc., LHF Productions, Inc., Rambo V Productions, Inc., Wicked Nevada, LLC, Cobbler Nevada, LLC, Trevor Short, Avi Lerner, 211 Productions, Inc., Hunter Killer Productions, Inc., Voltage Development NCCF, LLC, Millennium Funding, Inc., UN4 Productions, Inc., Fathers & Daughters Nevada, LLC, Homefront Productions, Inc., Stoic Productions, Inc., Bodyguard Productions, Inc., Clear Skies Nevada, LLC, Millennium Media, Inc., Status Update, LLC, Fallen Productions, Inc. and HB Productions, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01034
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by 211 Productions, Inc., Bodyguard Productions, Inc., Clear Skies Nevada, LLC, Cobbler Nevada, LLC, Criminal Productions, Inc., Fallen Productions, Inc., Fathers & Daughters Nevada, LLC, HB Productions, Inc., Homefront Productions, Inc., Hunter Killer Productions, Inc., LHF Productions, Inc., Avi Lerner, Millennium Funding, Inc., Millennium Media, Inc., Rambo V Productions, Inc., Trevor Short, Status Update, LLC, Stoic Productions, Inc., Survivor Productions, Inc., UN4 Productions, Inc., Voltage Development NCCF, LLC, Wicked Nevada, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Voltage Holdings, LLC for Clear Skies Nevada, LLC, Cobbler Nevada, LLC, Fathers & Daughters Nevada, LLC, Wicked Nevada, LLC added. (Culpepper, Kerry)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #12 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Kerry Steven Culpepper and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel F. Christopher Austin. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/5/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
August 5, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #12 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition,,, by Defendants 211 Productions, Inc., Bodyguard Productions, Inc., Clear Skies Nevada, LLC, Cobbler Nevada, LLC, Criminal Productions, Inc., Fallen Productions, Inc., Fathers & Daughters Nevada, LLC, HB Productions, Inc., Homefront Productions, Inc., Hunter Killer Productions, Inc., LHF Productions, Inc., Avi Lerner, Millennium Funding, Inc., Millennium Media, Inc., Rambo V Productions, Inc., Trevor Short, Status Update, LLC, Stoic Productions, Inc., Survivor Productions, Inc., UN4 Productions, Inc., Voltage Development NCCF, LLC, Wicked Nevada, LLC. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Austin, F.)
July 15, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hurricane Electric LLC re #5 Summons Issued. Avi Lerner waiver sent on 7/14/2020, answer due 9/12/2020; Trevor Short waiver sent on 7/14/2020, answer due 9/12/2020; Survivor Productions, Inc. waiver sent on 7/14/2020, answer due 9/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Trevor Short, #2 Survivor Productions, Inc.) (Dickey, Joshua)
July 15, 2020 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 7/15/2020 Re: #12 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition. INCOMPLETE. Counsel is directed to READ and COMPLY with the Local Rules of Practice for the United States District Court, District of Nevada, LR IA 10-2, "Admission to Practice in a Particular Case."Attorneys F. Christopher Austin nor Kerry Steven Culpepper CANNOT sign for their client. IT IS THE ORDER OF THE COURT that on Page 5, Appointment of Designated Resident Nevada Counsel, Plaintiff's "Authorized Representative" is directed to sign his/her name on the signature line, and print his/her name and title below the signature line. ( /s/ or a typewritten name is NOT acceptable). (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
July 14, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re #12 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition,,, by Defendants 211 Productions, Inc., Bodyguard Productions, Inc., Clear Skies Nevada, LLC, Cobbler Nevada, LLC, Criminal Productions, Inc., Fallen Productions, Inc., Fathers & Daughters Nevada, LLC, HB Productions, Inc., Homefront Productions, Inc., Hunter Killer Productions, Inc., LHF Productions, Inc., Avi Lerner, Millennium Funding, Inc., Millennium Media, Inc., Rambo V Productions, Inc., Trevor Short, Status Update, LLC, Stoic Productions, Inc., Survivor Productions, Inc., UN4 Productions, Inc., Voltage Development NCCF, LLC, Wicked Nevada, LLC. (Austin, F.)
July 14, 2020 Filing 12 VIEW Corrected Image #16 re: MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Kerry Steven Culpepper and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel F. Christopher Austin (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6083021) by Defendants 211 Productions, Inc., Bodyguard Productions, Inc., Clear Skies Nevada, LLC, Cobbler Nevada, LLC, Criminal Productions, Inc., Fallen Productions, Inc., Fathers & Daughters Nevada, LLC, HB Productions, Inc., Homefront Productions, Inc., Hunter Killer Productions, Inc., LHF Productions, Inc., Avi Lerner, Millennium Funding, Inc., Millennium Media, Inc., Rambo V Productions, Inc., Trevor Short, Status Update, LLC, Stoic Productions, Inc., Survivor Productions, Inc., UN4 Productions, Inc., Voltage Development NCCF, LLC, Wicked Nevada, LLC. (Austin, F.) Modified on 8/5/2020 (SLD).
June 30, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Kerry S. Culpepper to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 7/14/2020. (no image attached) (SLD)
June 29, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hurricane Electric LLC re #5 Summons Issued. 211 Productions, Inc. waiver sent on 6/22/2020, answer due 8/21/2020; Bodyguard Productions, Inc. waiver sent on 6/22/2020, answer due 8/21/2020; Clear Skies Nevada, LLC waiver sent on 6/18/2020, answer due 8/17/2020; Cobbler Nevada, LLC waiver sent on 6/18/2020, answer due 8/17/2020; Criminal Productions, Inc. waiver sent on 6/22/2020, answer due 8/21/2020; Fallen Productions, Inc. waiver sent on 6/22/2020, answer due 8/21/2020; Fathers & Daughters Nevada, LLC waiver sent on 6/18/2020, answer due 8/17/2020; HB Productions, Inc. waiver sent on 6/22/2020, answer due 8/21/2020; Homefront Productions, Inc. waiver sent on 6/22/2020, answer due 8/21/2020; Hunter Killer Productions, Inc. waiver sent on 6/22/2020, answer due 8/21/2020; LHF Productions, Inc. waiver sent on 6/22/2020, answer due 8/21/2020; Millennium Funding, Inc. waiver sent on 6/22/2020, answer due 8/21/2020; Millennium Media, Inc. waiver sent on 6/22/2020, answer due 8/21/2020; Rambo V Productions, Inc. waiver sent on 6/22/2020, answer due 8/21/2020; Status Update, LLC waiver sent on 6/18/2020, answer due 8/17/2020; Stoic Productions, Inc. waiver sent on 6/22/2020, answer due 8/21/2020; UN4 Productions, Inc. waiver sent on 6/22/2020, answer due 8/21/2020; Voltage Development NCCF, LLC waiver sent on 6/18/2020, answer due 8/17/2020; Wicked Nevada, LLC waiver sent on 6/18/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Cobbler Nevada LLC, #2 Fathers & Daughters Nevada, LLC, #3 Status Update, LLC, #4 Voltage Development NCCF, LLC, #5 Wicked Nevada LLC, #6 211 Productions, Inc., #7 Bodyguard Productions, Inc., #8 Criminal Productions, Inc., #9 Fallen Productions, Inc., #10 HB Productions, Inc., #11 Homefront Productions, Inc., #12 Hunter Killer Productions, Inc., #13 LHF Productions, Inc., #14 Millennium Funding, Inc., #15 Millennium Media, Inc., #16 Rambo V Productions, Inc., #17 Stoic Productions, Inc., #18 UN4 Productions, Inc.) (Dickey, Joshua)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Neil D. Greenstein and approving Designation of Local Counsel Joshua M. Dickey. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/24/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 23, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #6 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Plaintiff Hurricane Electric LLC. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Dickey, Joshua)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #6 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice. Proper Verified Petition due within 7 days. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Verified Petition Forms)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF with proper forms attached and mailed to counsel as directed - DRS)
June 18, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Neil D. Greenstein and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Joshua M. Dickey (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6049057) by Plaintiff Hurricane Electric LLC. (Dickey, Joshua)
June 16, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (DRS)
June 15, 2020 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued 211 Productions, Inc. by Plaintiff Hurricane Electric LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Bodyguard Productions, Inc., #2 Summons Cobbler Nevada, LLC, #3 Summons Criminal Productions, Inc., #4 Summons Fallen Productions, Inc., #5 Summons Fathers & Daughters Nevada, LLC, #6 Summons HB Productions, Inc., #7 Summons Homefront Productions, Inc., #8 Summons Hunter Killer Productions, Inc., #9 Summons Avi Lerner, #10 Summons LHF Productions, Inc., #11 Summons Millennium Funding, Inc., #12 Summons Millennium Media, Inc., #13 Summons Rambo V Productions, Inc., #14 Summons Trevor Short, #15 Summons Status Update, LLC, #16 Summons Stoic Productions, Inc., #17 Summons Survivor Productions, Inc., #18 Summons UN4 Productions, Inc., #19 Summons Voltage Development NCCF, LLC, #20 Summons Clear Skies Nevada, LLC, #21 Summons Wicked Nevada LLC) (Dickey, Joshua)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 AO 121 - REPORT on the filing of an action regarding a copyright. Mailed with a copy of the complaint to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. ( mailed this date - DRS) (Main Document 3 replaced on 6/11/2020) (DRS). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/11/2020: #1 Complaint sent to Copyright office) (DRS).
June 10, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (DRS)
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Hurricane Electric LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Mike Leber, Other Affiliate Paula Leber for Hurricane Electric LLC added. (Dickey, Joshua)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6038323) by Hurricane Electric LLC. Proof of service due by 9/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Civil Cover Sheet) (Dickey, Joshua) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hurricane Electric LLC v. Millennium Funding, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Criminal Productions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Survivor Productions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LHF Productions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rambo V Productions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wicked Nevada, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cobbler Nevada, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trevor Short
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avi Lerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 211 Productions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunter Killer Productions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Voltage Development NCCF, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millennium Funding, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UN4 Productions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fathers & Daughters Nevada, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homefront Productions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stoic Productions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bodyguard Productions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clear Skies Nevada, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millennium Media, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Status Update, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fallen Productions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HB Productions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hurricane Electric LLC
Represented By: Joshua M Dickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?