Nutri Pharmaceuticals Research, Inc. v. Stauber Performance Ingredients, Inc.
Plaintiff: Nutri Pharmaceuticals Research, Inc.
Defendant: Stauber Performance Ingredients, Inc., Stauber and Stauber Performance Ingredients, Inc. also known as Stauber doing business as Stauber California, a Minnesota corporation
Case Number: 2:2020cv01041
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Kent J Dawson
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #5 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Nutri Pharmaceuticals Research, Inc.. Replies due by 8/10/2020. (Takos, Zachary)
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Stauber Performance Ingredients, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Hawkins, Inc. for Stauber Performance Ingredients, Inc. added. (Pernsteiner, Adam)
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST for Judicial Notice re #5 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant Stauber Performance Ingredients, Inc.. (Pernsteiner, Adam)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Stauber Performance Ingredients, Inc.. Responses due by 8/3/2020. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 9/3/2020. (Pernsteiner, Adam) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
June 30, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nutri Pharmaceuticals Research, Inc. re #3 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,,. Stauber Performance Ingredients, Inc. served on 6/24/2020. (Takos, Zachary)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Stauber Performance Ingredients, Inc. re #1 Complaint. (JQC)
June 11, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (JQC)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Nutri Pharmaceuticals Research, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (Takos, Zachary)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nutri Pharmaceuticals Research, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6039350) by Nutri Pharmaceuticals Research, Inc.. Proof of service due by 9/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Takos, Zachary) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nutri Pharmaceuticals Research, Inc. v. Stauber Performance Ingredients, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stauber Performance Ingredients, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stauber
Represented By: Josh Cole Aicklen
Represented By: Adam J Pernsteiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stauber Performance Ingredients, Inc. also known as Stauber doing business as Stauber California, a Minnesota corporation
Represented By: Josh Cole Aicklen
Represented By: Adam J Pernsteiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nutri Pharmaceuticals Research, Inc.
Represented By: Zachary P. Takos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?