Covell v. Freeman Expositions, LLC et al
Plaintiff: William N. Covell, Jr.
Defendant: Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers Local Union No. 631, Freeman Expositions, LLC and Freeman Expositions, LLC doing business as Freeman
Case Number: 2:2020cv01058
Filed: June 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Freeman Expositions, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Trimmer, Paul) Modified by Clerk's Office on 8/4/2020 to add Freeman Holding, LLC and Freeman Decorating Co as interested parties (EDS).
August 4, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Freeman Expositions, LLC.(Trimmer, Paul)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendnat Freeman Expositions, LLC to File a Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Freeman Expositions, LLC answer due 8/3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/30/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
July 29, 2020 Filing 12 First STIPULATION to Extend Time For Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff''s re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Freeman Expositions, LLC. (Trimmer, Paul)
July 24, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers Local Union No. 631. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Myers, Eric)
July 24, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers Local Union No. 631. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 9/7/2020.(Myers, Eric) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond. Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers Local Union No. 631 answer or other response due 7/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/15/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
July 14, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) for Defendant Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen And Helpers, Local Union 631 to Answer or Respond re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers Local Union No. 631. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Myers, Eric)
July 14, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William N. Covell, Jr re #1 Complaint,, #3 Summons Issued. Freeman Expositions, LLC served on 6/29/2020. (Bailey, Vernon)
July 14, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Eric B. Myers on behalf of Defendant Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers Local Union No. 631. (Myers, Eric)
July 10, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William N. Covell, Jr re #1 Complaint,, #3 Summons Issued. Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers Local Union No. 631 served on 6/26/2020. (Bailey, Vernon)
June 15, 2020 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
June 15, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Freeman Expositions, LLC, Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers Local Union No. 631 re #1 Complaint. (ADR)
June 13, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (ADR)
June 13, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by William N. Covell, Jr. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Bailey, Vernon)
June 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6042488) by William N. Covell, Jr. Proof of service due by 9/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Freeman, #3 Summons Teamsters) (Bailey, Vernon) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Covell v. Freeman Expositions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers Local Union No. 631
Represented By: Eric B. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freeman Expositions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freeman Expositions, LLC doing business as Freeman
Represented By: Lynne McChrystal
Represented By: Paul T. Trimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William N. Covell, Jr.
Represented By: Vernon L. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?