Cenegenics, LLC v. Anti-Aging and Wellness Clinic, aka Anti-Aging and Wellness, aka Anti Aging & Wellness Clinic, aka Antiage and Wellness Clinic et al
Plaintiff: Cenegenics, LLC
Defendant: Anti Aging Costa Rica aka Anti-Aging Costa Rica, James D. Richie, Anti-Aging and Wellness Clinic, aka Anti-Aging and Wellness, aka Anti Aging & Wellness Clinic, aka Antiage and Wellness Clinic and Aluvalife, LLC, aka Anti-Aging and Wellness, aka Anti-Aging and Wellness Clinic, d/b/a Anti-Aging and Wellness Medical
Case Number: 2:2020cv01081
Filed: June 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting #5 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Matthew Daniel Murphey and approving Designation of Local Counsel Maximilien Fetaz. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 7/8/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
July 1, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Matthew D. Murphey and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Maximilien D. Fetaz (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6066956) by Plaintiff Cenegenics, LLC. (Fetaz, Maximilien)
June 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Matthew Daniel Murphey to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 7/1/2020. (no image attached) (JQC)
June 17, 2020 Filing 3 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (JQC)
June 17, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (JQC)
June 16, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Cenegenics, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Fetaz, Maximilien)
June 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aluvalife, LLC, Anti Aging Costa Rica, Anti-Aging and Wellness Clinic, James D. Richie (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6045735) by Cenegenics, LLC. Proof of service due by 9/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Fetaz, Maximilien) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified on 6/17/2020 to remove aka's and dba's (DKJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cenegenics, LLC v. Anti-Aging and Wellness Clinic, aka Anti-Aging and Wellness, aka Anti Aging & Wellness Clinic, aka Antiage and Wellness Clinic et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anti Aging Costa Rica aka Anti-Aging Costa Rica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James D. Richie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anti-Aging and Wellness Clinic, aka Anti-Aging and Wellness, aka Anti Aging & Wellness Clinic, aka Antiage and Wellness Clinic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aluvalife, LLC, aka Anti-Aging and Wellness, aka Anti-Aging and Wellness Clinic, d/b/a Anti-Aging and Wellness Medical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cenegenics, LLC
Represented By: Michael D Rounds
Represented By: Maximilien Fetaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?