Mayweather et al v. CVSM, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Rhia Mayweather, Jessica Blair, Jessie Waller and Ashley Lee
Defendant: CVSM, LLC, Steve Paik, Shuan McDivitt and CVSM, LLC doing business as Centerfolds Cabaret
Case Number: 2:2020cv01111
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants CVSM, LLC, Shuan McDivitt, Steve Paik. Responses due by 8/24/2020. (Johnson, Kevin)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. The Court GRANTS #13 the parties stipulation. All other requirements in the Court's #9 Order at Docket remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/10/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
August 7, 2020 Filing 13 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) TO CONTINUE (First Request) or slightly delay start until 9:45 am by Plaintiffs Jessica Blair, Ashley Lee, Rhia Mayweather, Jessie Waller. (Huber, Burke)
July 31, 2020 Filing 12 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Plaintiffs by Rhia Mayweather, Jessica Blair, Jessie Waller. No changes to parties. (Huber, Burke)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #10 Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: #8 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 7/31/2020. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/23/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
July 22, 2020 Filing 10 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #8 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Rhia Mayweather. (Huber, Burke)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER setting Early Neutral Evaluation session. Early Neutral Evaluation session is hereby scheduled to commence 8/24/2020, at 9:30 a.m. The ENE will be held remotely by video, with further instructions to be provided at a later date regarding the logistics for appearances. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/10/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
July 9, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants CVSM, LLC, Shuan McDivitt, Steve Paik. Responses due by 7/23/2020. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/23/2020. (Johnson, Kevin) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
July 6, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendants CVSM, LLC, Shuan McDivitt, Steve Paik. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Johnson, Kevin)
June 24, 2020 Filing 6 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants CVSM, LLC, Shuan McDivitt, Steve Paik. (Johnson, Kevin)
June 19, 2020 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
June 19, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/19/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 7/4/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 7/19/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
June 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (JQC)
June 19, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (JQC)
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by CVSM, LLC, Shuan McDivitt, Steve Paik. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Johnson, Kevin)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 VIEW #7 corrected image re PETITION FOR REMOVAL from 8th Judicial District Court, Case Number A-20-813743-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-6049636) by Shuan McDivitt, CVSM, LLC, Steve Paik. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2) (Johnson, Kevin) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified on 7/6/2020 (DKJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mayweather et al v. CVSM, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhia Mayweather
Represented By: Richard A Harris
Represented By: Burke Huber
Represented By: Benjamin Paul Cloward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Blair
Represented By: Richard A Harris
Represented By: Burke Huber
Represented By: Benjamin Paul Cloward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie Waller
Represented By: Richard A Harris
Represented By: Burke Huber
Represented By: Benjamin Paul Cloward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Lee
Represented By: Richard A Harris
Represented By: Burke Huber
Represented By: Benjamin Paul Cloward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVSM, LLC
Represented By: Kevin M. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Paik
Represented By: Kevin M. Johnson
Represented By: Stan Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shuan McDivitt
Represented By: Kevin M. Johnson
Represented By: Stan Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVSM, LLC doing business as Centerfolds Cabaret
Represented By: Kevin M. Johnson
Represented By: Stan Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?