Carter et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Tamara Carter and David Carter
Defendant: Ethicon Women's Health and Urology, Gynecare, Johnson & Johnson, Ethicon LLC and Ethicon, Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv01232
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Kent J Dawson
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER granting #156 Verified Petition for Permission for Diane K. Watkins to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel Peter Wetherall. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 8/10/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER granting #157 Verified Petition for Permission for Thomas P. Cartmell to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel Peter Wetherall. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 8/10/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 7, 2020 Filing 157 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Thomas P. Cartmell and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Peter C. Wetherall (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6117864) by Plaintiffs David Carter, Tamara Carter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Cert of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Cert of Good Standing) (Wetherall, Peter)
August 7, 2020 Filing 156 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Diane K. Watkins and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Peter C. Wetherall (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6117762) by Plaintiffs David Carter, Tamara Carter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Cert of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Cert of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit Cert of Good Standing, #5 Exhibit Cert of Good Standing) (Wetherall, Peter)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting #153 Motion to Remove Attorneys Christy D. Jones, Pamela Lawrence, Anita Modak-Truran, Jordan N. Walker, Kari L. Sutherland, Matthew P. Smith, William M. Gage, David B. Thomas, Philip J. Combs, Susan M. Robinson from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/16/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 15, 2020 Filing 154 NOTICE of Docket Correction to #153 Motion : ERROR: Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c). The wrong event was selected. CORRECTION: The clerk modified the event from a Misc. Motion to a Motion Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. No further action is required to document #153 . (no image attached) (DKJ)
July 15, 2020 Filing 153 MOTION to remove attorney Christy D. Jones, Pamela Lawrence, Anita Modak-Truran, Jordan N. Walker, Kari L. Sutherland, Matthew P. Smith, William M. Gage, David B. Thomas, Philip J. Combs, Susan M. Robinson from the Electronic Service List in this case by Defendant Johnson & Johnson. Modified event on 7/15/2020 (DKJ).
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER granting #151 Motion to Substitute Attorney Robert McCoy and Sihomara L. Graves. Attorney David B. Thomas; Philip J. Combs and Susan M. Robinson terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/14/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 13, 2020 Filing 151 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Defendants Ethicon LLC, Ethicon, Inc, Johnson & Johnson. (McCoy, Robert)
July 2, 2020 Filing 150 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sihomara L. Graves on behalf of Defendants Ethicon, Inc, Johnson & Johnson. (Graves, Sihomara)
July 1, 2020 Filing 149 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:12-cv-01661. Original file with transfer order and docket sheet received. (JQC)
July 1, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (JQC)
June 28, 2020 Filing 148 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 MDL ECF(2666) Memorandum Opinion Order re Daubert Motion for Daniel Elliott, M.D., #2 MDL ECF(2642) Memorandum Opinion Order re Daubert Motion for Prf. Dr. Med. Uwe Klinge, #3 MDL ECF(3544) Memorandum Opinion Order re Daubert Motion for Paul J. Michael, M.D., #4 MDL ECF(2664) Memorandum Opinion Order re Daubert Motion for Peggy Pence, Ph.D., #5 MDL ECF(2687) Memorandum Opinion Order re Daubert Motion for Brian Raybon, M.D, #6 MDL ECF(2668) Memorandum Opinion Order re Daubert Motion for Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D., #7 MDL ECF(2695) Memorandum Opinion Order re Daubert Motion for Juan Carlos Felix, M.D, #8 MDL ECF(2728) Memorandum Opinion Order re Daubert Motion for Dr. Salil Khandwala, M.D., #9 MDL ECF(2724) Memorandum Opinion Order re Daubert Motion for Steven Maclean, Ph.D. P.E., #10 MDL ECF(2650) Memorandum Opinion Order re Daubert Motion for Christina Pramudji, M.D., #11 MDL ECF(2649) Memorandum Opinion Order re Daubert Motion for Timothy Ulatowski, M.D.)(Watkins, Diane) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 147 CONTINUATION OF JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #134 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2060) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2065) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2134) - Defs' Resp to Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2232) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (7346) Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2910) Defs Supp Resp and Notice of Adoption of Resp Regarding Timothy Ulatowski, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (8755) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (8822) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/24/2020 to add party filers) (mkw). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 146 CONTINUATION OF JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #134 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2035) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Christina Pramudji, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2037) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Christina Pramudji, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2153) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Christina Pramudji, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2236) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Christina Pramudji, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2530) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Christina Pramudji, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (8735) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Christina Pramudji, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (8866) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Mot to Exclude Christina Pramudji)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/24/2020 to add party filers) (mkw). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 145 CONTINUATION OF JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #134 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2205) Part 1 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2205) Part 2 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2205) Part 3 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2206) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2287) Part 1 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2287) Part 2 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2297) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 1 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 2 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 3 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2825) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2826) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2942) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (3053) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (8731) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (8832) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/24/2020 to add party filers) (mkw). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 144 CONTINUATION OF JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #134 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2003) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2004) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2175) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2240) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2469) Pls Amended Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2470) Pls Amended Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2618) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2925) Defs Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (8727) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (8852) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/24/2020 to add party filers) (mkw). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 143 CONTINUATION OF JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #134 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2063) Part 1 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2063) Part 2 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2069) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2184) Part 1 Defs Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2184) Part 2 Defs Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2255) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (8711) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (8820) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/24/2020 to add party filers) (mkw). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 142 CONTINUATION OF JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #134 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (5482) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (5548) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (8776) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (8858) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/24/2020 to add party filers) (mkw). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 141 CONTINUATION OF JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #134 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2047) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 4 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 5 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 6 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 7 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 8 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 9 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 10 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 11 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 12 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 13 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 14 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (2049) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 1 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 3 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (2241) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (2817) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #21 Exhibit MDL ECF (2818) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #22 Exhibit MDL ECF (2931) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #23 Exhibit MDL ECF (3024) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #24 Exhibit MDL ECF (5332) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #25 Exhibit MDL ECF (5333) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/24/2020 to add party filers) (mkw). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 140 CONTINUATION OF JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #134 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2115) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Brian Raybon, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2116) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Brian Raybon, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2201) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Brian Raybon, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2264) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Brian Raybon, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2461) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Brian Raybon, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2527) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Brian Raybon, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (8795) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Brian Raybon, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (8857) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp of Brian Raybon)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/24/2020 to add party filers) (mkw). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 139 CONTINUATION OF JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #134 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2075) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2078) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2172) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2214) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2759) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2760) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2949) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3017) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (8807) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (8855) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/24/2020 to add party filers) (mkw). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 138 CONTINUATION OF JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #134 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2436) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2436) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2436) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2436) Part 4 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2441) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2555) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2619) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3663) Part 1 Defs Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (3663) Part 2 Defs Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (3663) Part 3 Defs Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (3666) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (3792) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (3814) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (8783) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (8849) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/24/2020 to add party filers) (mkw). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 137 CONTINUATION OF JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #134 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2188) Part 1 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 3 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 4 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2200) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (3626) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (3626) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3630) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 1 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 3 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 4 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 5 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 6 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (3855) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (8779) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (8842) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/24/2020 to add party filers) (mkw). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 136 CONTINUATION OF JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #134 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (1978) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 4 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 5 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 6 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 7 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 8 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 9 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 10 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 11 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 12 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 13 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 14 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 15 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 16 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 17 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 18 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 19 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 20 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #21 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 21 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #22 Exhibit MDL ECF (1982) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/24/2020 to add party filers) (mkw). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 135 CONTINUATION OF JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #134 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2082) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Daniel Elliott, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2082) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Daniel Elliott, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2082) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Daniel Elliott, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2085) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Daniel Elliott, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2191) - Pls' Amended Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Daniel Elliott, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2215) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Daniel Elliott, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2815) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Daniel Elliott, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2952) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Daniel Elliott, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (8080) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Daniel Elliott, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (8080) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Daniel Elliott, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (8080) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Daniel Elliott, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (8080) Part 4 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Daniel Elliott, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (8081) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Daniel Elliott, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (8247) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Daniel Elliott, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (8312) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Daniel Elliott, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (8778) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Daniel Elliott, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (8835) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Daniel Elliott)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/24/2020 to add party filers) (mkw). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 134 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (238) First Amended Master Long Form Complaint, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (239) Master Answer of Ethicon, Inc. to First Amended Master Complaint, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (241) Master Answer of Johnson & Johnson to First Amended Master Complaint, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (262) - Short Form Complaint, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (263) Amended Short Form Complaint)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/24/2020 to add party filers) (mkw). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 133 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that the Order and Suggestion of Remand in MDL 2327 at ECF No. 9144 is VACATED; on 07/01/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 6/30/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/17/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 132 VACATED PURSUANT TO THE #133 TRANSFER ORDER ENTERED ON 6/17/2020: ORDER AND SUGGESTION OF REMAND Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 and the Rules for Multidistrict Litigation, the court suggests that the cases on Exhibit A be remanded to the courts from which they came, as identified on the attached Exhibit A; on or before 6/24/2020 the parties are directed to confer and to file in this case, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the court directs that upon receipt and filing of an order to remand from the Clerk of the JPMDL, the Clerk shall remand the case to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A; on the Transfer Date, the Clerk is directed to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract the cases on Exhibit A and remand them to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A; after remand of the cases, the Clerk is directed to formally close the cases and strike them from the docket. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/17/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; cases on Exhibit A) (maw) (Modified on 6/18/2020 to note order has been vacated) (kew). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
October 21, 2019 Filing 131 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Family and Friends on TBD at TBD (Lawrence, Pamela) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
September 20, 2019 Filing 130 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Amended Designation and Disclosure of General and Case Specific Expert Witnesses and Non-Retained Expert Disclosures. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
September 18, 2019 Filing 129 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Tamara Carter of Thomas Storozuk on October 3, 2019 at 9:00am (Watkins, Diane) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
September 18, 2019 Filing 128 RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA for Thomas Storozuk. (Watkins, Diane) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
September 6, 2019 Filing 127 NOTICE of Subpoena for Thomas Storozuk to Testify at Deposition by Tamara Carter. (Watkins, Diane) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
September 6, 2019 Filing 126 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Tamara Carter of Thomas Storozuk on October 3, 2019 at 9:00am (Watkins, Diane) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
August 19, 2019 Filing 125 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tamara Carter for Plaintiffs Designation and Disclosure of General and Case-Specific Expert Witnesses (Kuntz, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
June 6, 2019 Filing 124 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Pamela Lawrence on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Lawrence, Pamela) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
June 3, 2019 Filing 123 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Matthew P. Smith on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Smith, Matthew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 122 FIRST AMENDED PLAINTIFF FACT SHEET filed by David Carter, Tamara Carter. (Kuntz, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 121 PRETRIAL ORDER # 337 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 12 Cases) The court ORDERS that the cases on Exhibit A are: (1) removed from the pending inactive docket; and (2) placed on the active docket. The court further ORDERS that: (1) The cases are no longer eligible for return to the inactive docket nor may notices of settlement be filed to relieve the parties from scheduling deadlines; (2) To the extent other defendants, in addition to Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson, are named in the cases on Exhibit A, the deadlines below also apply to them; (3) The Clerk will file this Docket Control Order in the main MDL and every case listed on Exhibit A become subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order; and (4) The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 12 cases with one important exception, as more fully set forth herein. Scheduling Deadlines. The following deadlines shall apply in all Ethicon Wave 12 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 05/11/2019. Defendant Fact Sheets due by 05/20/2019. Deadline for written discovery requests due by 06/20/2019. Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs due by 08/19/2019. Expert disclosure served by defendants due by 09/18/2019. Expert disclosure served for rebuttal due by 09/25/2019. Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/25/2019. Filing of dispositive motions due by 11/01/2019. Response to dispositive motions due by 11/15/2019. Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 11/22/2019. Filing of Daubert motions due by 11/04/2019. Responses to Daubert motions due by 11/18/2019. Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/25/2019. Confidential Documents. Issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 9/20/2019, and any response is due by 10/3/2019. Any reply is due by 10/10/2019. Venue Recommendations. The parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases no later than 10/08/2019, the parties are ORDERED to file joint venue recommendations by 10/18/2019. The parties' joint recommendation(s) shall identify cases where venue is in dispute. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/1/2019. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 12 cases identified on Exhibit A) (mwk) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 INACTIVE DOCKET ORDER Having been advised by counsel that in the case(s) listed on the attached Exhibit(s), the plaintiff(s) and Ethicon, Inc. have agreed to a settlement model. The Court having found the proposed inactive docket order was filed with the Clerks office on or before 10/31/2018, pursuant to a PTO, the Court ORDERS as follows: 1) all discovery deadlines are continued until further order of the Court, 2) the Clerk place the case(s) listed on the attached Exhibit(s) on the pending inactive docket, 3) Plaintiff(s) and defendant may submit an agreed order of dismissal with prejudice on or before 4/29/2019; if settlements are not finalized and dismissal orders are not submitted by then, any case remaining on an inactive docket will be moved to the active docket and placed on a shortened Docket Control Order. Counsel for plaintiff(s) and defendant(s) are directed to provide quarterly reports as to their progress. The Court will reinstate any case on the attached Exhibit(s) to the active docket if one of the parties, on motion, shows good cause for such reinstatement. This Order is linked to the Proposed Inactive Docket Order filed at ECF No. 5749 Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/30/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (hkl) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 10/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2327 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2327 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/15/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases on inactive docket) (mek) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 INACTIVE DOCKET ORDER: The court has been advised that the plaintiff(s) and Ethicon, Inc. have reached a settlement with regard to Ethicon. All discovery deadlines are continued until further order of the court. Plaintiff(s) and Ethicon may submit an agreed order of dismissal with prejudice on or before 8/31/2018; if settlements are not finalized and dismissal orders are not submitted by then the Court will have a hearing to determine the appropriate action pertaining to any remaining cases on the inactive docket. Counsel for plaintiffs and defendant(s) are directed to provide quarterly reports as to their progress in dismissing cases on the inactive docket. This Order is related to the Proposed Inactive Docket Order filed at ECF No. 5749 in MDL Case No. 2327 Ethicon. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/25/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (mek) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
March 8, 2018 Filing 117 NOTICE OF REQUEST TO BE REMOVED FROM THE COURT'S SERVICE LIST by Danny L. Curtis on behalf of David Carter, Tamara Carter. (Curtis, Danny) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 PRETRIAL ORDER #270 (ORDER RE: STIPULATIONS EXTENDING DISCOVERY) After a cursory review of many individual cases in the Ethicon MDL, the court notes that the parties have attempted to stipulate a change in the court's Docket Control Orders setting deadlines for discovery. The parties cannot extend court ordered discovery deadlines past the date set for completion of discovery without approval from the court. Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 29(b); see Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 16(b)(4). Here, the parties are repeatedly attempting to stipulate to delay the completion of discovery, which affects other deadlines in the Docket Control Orders, such as the deadline for filing dispositive motions and the deadline for filing Daubert motions. Under Local Rule 16.1(f)(3), the court is not required to, nor does it, recognize stipulations purporting to extend the discovery deadlines past the close of discovery. See LR Civ. P. 16.1(f)(3). Therefore, all such stipulations filed in the Ethicon MDL which are inconsistent with Local Rule 16.1(f)(3) are INEFFECTUAL and VOID. Such stipulations undermine the policy goals of the MDL, including convenience of the parties, efficiency of the pretrial proceedings, and consistency on related issues. The parties are DIRECTED to cease filing such stipulations purporting to extend the discovery deadlines contrary to Local Rule 16.1(f)(3). When the parties seek an extension of discovery deadlines past the date set for the completion of discovery in the Docket Control Order, they must do so by motion in the individual case. The Docket Control Orders are plain that the only discovery permitted after the close of discovery are depositions of the plaintiff's friends and family members, and only if such depositions are requested before the discovery deadline. Those orders remain unaffected. Modifications of the discovery schedule may be considered, for good cause shown. Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(4); see, e.g., PTO #251 at A.2.f. Good cause does not include mere agreement of the parties. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 9/13/2017. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL Panel; attys) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, and 7 Cases) (crg) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
June 14, 2017 Filing 115 PLAINTIFF FACT SHEET filed by Tamara Carter. (Cartmell, Thomas) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER (Vacating Order Daubert Motion re: Mareeni Stanislaus, M.D.) It is directed that the Memorandum Opinion and Order (Daubert Motion re: Mareeni Stanislaus, M.D.) entered on 3/29/2017 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/10/2017. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases identified in Exhibit A attached to the 3/29/2017 Order) (hkl) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER ADOPTING MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert ruling re: Jerry Blaivas, M.D.) Directing that the Memorandum Opinion and Order (Daubert ruling re: Jerry Blaivas, M.D.) entered on 8/26/2016, as to the Ethicon Wave 1 cases is ADOPTED in the Wave 2 cases identified in Exhibit A. The court FINDS that to the extent that the parties raise arguments not previously addressed by the court's Prior Order, the trial judge may easily resolve these issues at trial without the need for further briefing or an evidentiary hearing; to the extent that the parties raise Daubert challenges not previously addressed in the court's Prior Order - fully adopted herein - those challenges are RESERVED for trial. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/31/2017. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases on Exhibit A) (hkl) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER ADOPTING MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert ruling re: Daniel Elliot, M.D.) Directing that the Memorandum Opinion and Order (Daubert Motion re: Daniel Elliot, M.D.) entered in MDL 2327 on 8/26/2016, as to the Ethicon Wave 1 cases is ADOPTED in the Wave 2 cases identified in Exhibit A. The court FINDS that to the extent that the parties raise arguments not previously addressed by the court's Prior Order, the trial judge may easily resolve these issues at trial without the need for further briefing or an evidentiary hearing; to the extent that the parties raise Daubert challenges not previously addressed in the court's Prior Order - fully adopted herein - those challenges are RESERVED for trial. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/29/2017. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases on Exhibit A) (mks) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 VACATED PURSUANT TO THE #114 ORDER ENTERED 4/10/2017: MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert Motion re: Mareeni Stanislaus, M.D.) The Motion by Certain Plaintiffs in Wave 2 Cases to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Mareeni Stanislaus, M.D. is DENIED in part, GRANTED in part, and RESERVED in part, as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/29/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases on Exhibit A) (mek) (Modified on 4/11/2017 to note order has been vacated) (kp). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert Motion re: Larry T. Sirls, M.D.) The Motion by Certain Plaintiffs in Wave 2 Cases to Exclude the General Opinion Testimony of Larry T. Sirls, II, M.D. is DENIED in part, GRANTED in part, and RESERVED in part, as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/29/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases on Exhibit A) (hkl) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER (Vacating Order Adopting Memorandum Opinion and Order (Daubert ruling re: Daniel Elliot, M.D.)) The Order entered in MDL 2327 on 3/28/2017 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/29/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A attached to the Order) (ts) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER ADOPTING MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert ruling re: Timothy Ulatowski, M.D.) Directing that the Memorandum Opinion and Order (Daubert Motion re: Timothy Ulatowski) entered in MDL 2327 at ECF No. 2649 on 8/25/2016, as to the Ethicon Wave 1 cases is ADOPTED in the Wave 2 cases identified in Exhibit A. The court FINDS that to the extent that the parties raise arguments not previously addressed by the court's Prior Order, the trial judge may easily resolve these issues at trial without the need for further briefing or an evidentiary hearing; to the extent that the parties raise Daubert challenges not previously addressed in the court's Prior Order - fully adopted herein - those challenges are RESERVED for trial. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/29/2017. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases on Exhibit A) (hkl) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert Motion re: Paul J. Michaels, M.D.) The Motion by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Paul J. Michaels, M.D. in Certain Wave 2 Cases is DENIED in part, GRANTED in part, and RESERVED in part, as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/29/2017. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A) (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Identified in Exhibit A) (kp) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting the Motion by Certain Plaintiffs in Wave 2 Cases to Strike Dr. Shelby F. Thames' Supplemental Reports or, in the Alternative, for Leave to File a Daubert Motion Based on the Flawed Methodology Employed Therein filed in MDL 2327 at ECF No. 2882, as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/28/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (hkl) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 VACATED PURSUANT TO THE #109 ORDER ENTERED ON 3/29/2017: ORDER ADOPTING MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert ruling re: Daniel Elliot, M.D.) Directing that the Memorandum Opinion and Order (Daubert Motion re: Daniel Elliot, M.D.) entered in MDL 2327 at ECF No. 2666 on 8/26/2016, as to the Ethicon Wave 1 cases is ADOPTED in the Wave 2 cases identified in Exhibit A. The court FINDS that to the extent that the parties raise arguments not previously addressed by the court's Prior Order, the trial judge may easily resolve these issues at trial without the need for further briefing or an evidentiary hearing; to the extent that the parties raise Daubert challenges not previously addressed in the court's Prior Order - fully adopted herein - those challenges are RESERVED for trial. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/28/2017. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases on Exhibit A) (kp) (Modified on 3/29/2017 to note order has been vacated)(ts). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER ADOPTING MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert ruling re: Steven MacLean, Ph.D., P.E.) Directing that the Memorandum Opinion and Order (Daubert ruling re: Steven MacLean, Ph.D., P.E.) filed in MDL 2327 on 9/2/2016 as to the Ethicon Wave 1 cases is ADOPTED in the Wave 2 cases identified in Exhibit A. The court FINDS that to the extent that the parties raise arguments not previously addressed by the court's Prior Order, the trial judge may easily resolve these issues at trial without the need for further briefing or an evidentiary hearing; to the extent that the parties raise Daubert challenges not previously addressed in the court's Prior Order - fully adopted herein - those challenges are RESERVED for trial. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/27/2017. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases on Exhibit A) (kp) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER ADOPTING MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert ruling re: Christina Pramudji, M.D.) Directing that the Memorandum Opinion and Order (Daubert Motion re: Christina Pramudji, M.D.) filed in MDL 2327 on 8/25/2016, as to the Ethicon Wave 1 cases is ADOPTED in the Wave 2 cases identified in Exhibit A. The court FINDS that to the extent that the parties raise arguments not previously addressed by the court's Prior Order, the trial judge may easily resolve these issues at trial without the need for further briefing or an evidentiary hearing; to the extent that the parties raise Daubert challenges not previously addressed in the court's Prior Order - fully adopted herein - those challenges are RESERVED for trial. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/27/2017. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases on Exhibit A) (mks) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER ADOPTING MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert ruling re: Peggy Pence, Ph.D.) Directing that the Memorandum Opinion and Order (Daubert ruling re: Peggy Pence, Ph.D.) filed in MDL 2327 on 8/25/2016 as to the Ethicon Wave 1 cases is ADOPTED in the Wave 2 cases identified in Exhibit A. The court FINDS that to the extent that the parties raise arguments not previously addressed by the court's Prior Order, the trial judge may easily resolve these issues at trial without the need for further briefing or an evidentiary hearing; to the extent that the parties raise Daubert challenges not previously addressed in the court's Prior Order - fully adopted herein - those challenges are RESERVED for trial. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/27/2017. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases on Exhibit A) (kp) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER ADOPTING MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert ruling re: Juan Carlos Felix, M.D.) Directing that the Memorandum Opinion and Order (Daubert ruling re: Juan Carlos Felix, M.D.) entered in MDL 2327 on 8/31/2016 as to the Ethicon Wave 1 cases is ADOPTED in the Wave 2 cases identified in Exhibit A. The Memorandum Opinion and Order (Daubert ruling re: Juan Carlos Felix, M.D.) is attached as Exhibit B. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 12/16/2016. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 2 cases identified in the Exhibit attached) (kp) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER ADOPTING MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert ruling re: Howard Jordi, Ph.D.) Directing that the Memorandum Opinion and Order (Daubert Motion re: Howard Jordi, Ph.D.) entered in MDL 2327 on 8/31/2016 as to the Ethicon Wave 1 cases is ADOPTED in the Wave 2 cases identified in Exhibit A. The Memorandum Opinion and Order (Daubert Motion re: Howard Jordi, Ph.D.) is attached as Exhibit B. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 12/16/2016. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 2 cases identified in the Exhibit attached) (kp) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 PRETRIAL ORDER # 241 (Re: Order Dismissing Ethicon, LLC in Cases Listed on Exhibit A) dismissing without prejudice Ethicon, LLC from each case identified on Exhibit A, as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/12/2016. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (bdr) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
August 18, 2016 Filing 98 REPLY by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #95 Response In Opposition. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
August 18, 2016 Filing 97 REPLY by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #94 Response In Opposition. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
August 16, 2016 Filing 96 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by David Carter, Tamara Carter for Second Supplemental Exhibit B to Dr. Daniel Elliott's expert report, contained within Plaintiff's Designation and Disclosure of General and Case-Specific Expert Witnesses (Kuntz, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
August 8, 2016 Filing 95 RESPONSE by David Carter, Tamara Carter in opposition to #82 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Exclude Case Specific Opinions of Daniel Elliott, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Exhibit(s) H)(Kuntz, Jeffrey) Modified to remove link to #83 Memorandum on 8/16/2016 (gjb). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
August 8, 2016 Filing 94 RESPONSE by David Carter, Tamara Carter in opposition to #86 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Exclude Case-Specific Opinions of Paul Michaels, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Kuntz, Jeffrey) Modified to remove link to #87 Memorandum on 8/16/2016 (gjb). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
August 5, 2016 Filing 93 RESPONSE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in opposition to #80 MOTION by David Carter, Tamara Carter to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Christina Pramudji, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Jones, Christy) (Modified on 8/16/2016 to remove link to #81 memorandum) (skh). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
August 5, 2016 Filing 92 RESPONSE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in opposition to #84 MOTION by David Carter, Tamara Carter to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Juan Felix, M.D. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Jones, Christy) (Modified on 8/16/2016 to remove link to #85 memorandum) (skh). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
August 4, 2016 Filing 91 REPLY by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #89 Memorandum In Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
August 3, 2016 Filing 90 REPLY by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #89 Memorandum In Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
July 25, 2016 Filing 89 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by David Carter, Tamara Carter in opposition to #73 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Kuntz, Jeffrey) (Modified on 7/29/2016 to remove link to #74 memorandum) (skh). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
July 25, 2016 Filing 88 RESPONSE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in opposition to #76 MOTION by David Carter, Tamara Carter for Partial Summary Judgment (Jones, Christy) (Modified on 7/29/2016 to remove link to #77 memorandum)(skh). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
July 21, 2016 Filing 87 MEMORANDUM by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of #86 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Exclude Case-Specific Opinions of Paul Michaels, M.D. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
July 21, 2016 Filing 86 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Exclude Case-Specific Opinions of Paul Michaels, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
July 21, 2016 Filing 85 MEMORANDUM by David Carter, Tamara Carter in support of #84 MOTION by David Carter, Tamara Carter to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Juan Felix, M.D. (Kuntz, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
July 21, 2016 Filing 84 MOTION by David Carter, Tamara Carter to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Juan Felix, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Kuntz, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
July 21, 2016 Filing 83 MEMORANDUM by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of #82 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Limit Case-Specific Opinions of Daniel Elliott, M.D. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
July 21, 2016 Filing 82 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Limit Case-Specific Opinions of Daniel Elliott, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
July 21, 2016 Filing 81 MEMORANDUM by David Carter, Tamara Carter in support of #80 MOTION by David Carter, Tamara Carter to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Christina Pramudji, M.D. (Kuntz, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
July 21, 2016 Filing 80 MOTION by David Carter, Tamara Carter to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Christina Pramudji, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Kuntz, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
July 18, 2016 Filing 79 CROSS-NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by David Carter, Tamara Carter of Dr. Saleha Baig on July 29, 2016 at 6:00 p.m. (Attachment: #1 PTO 38 - Depo Protocol)(Kuntz, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
July 13, 2016 Filing 78 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Saleha Baig on July 29, 2016 at 6:00 pm (Attachments: #1 Subpoena, #2 Schedule A, #3 Pre-Trial Order 38-Deposition Protocol)(Modak-Truran, Anita) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
July 8, 2016 Filing 77 MEMORANDUM by David Carter, Tamara Carter in support of #76 MOTION by David Carter, Tamara Carter for Partial Summary Judgment (Kuntz, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
July 8, 2016 Filing 76 MOTION by David Carter, Tamara Carter for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Kuntz, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
July 8, 2016 Filing 75 OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #69 Notice to Take Deposition of Dr. Elizabeth Grill (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
July 8, 2016 Filing 74 MEMORANDUM by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of #73 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
July 8, 2016 Filing 73 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
July 5, 2016 Filing 72 OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #67 Notice to Take Deposition of Dr. Juan Felix (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
July 1, 2016 Filing 71 STIPULATION AND AGREEMENT of the Parties Regarding Depositions of Plaintiffs' Friends and Family Members by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Tamara Carter, David Carter (Modak-Truran, Anita) (Modified on 7/18/2016 to add party filers) (rea). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
July 1, 2016 Filing 70 STIPULATION AND AGREEMENT of the Parties Regarding the Video Deposition of Saleha Baig, M.D. by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Tamara Carter, David Carter (Modak-Truran, Anita) (Modified on 7/18/2016 to add party filers) (rea). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
June 28, 2016 Filing 69 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by David Carter, Tamara Carter of Dr. Elizabeth Grill on July 7, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. (Attachments: #1 PTO 38 - Depo Protocol)(Kuntz, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
June 27, 2016 Filing 68 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by David Carter, Tamara Carter for Supplemental Exhibit B to Dr. Daniel Elliott's expert report, contained within Plaintiff's Designation and Disclosure of General and Case-Specific Expert Witnesses (Kuntz, Jeffrey) (Modified on 6/27/2016 to replace incorrect image with correct image) (rea). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
June 27, 2016 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #68 Certificate of Service. ERROR: Incorrect image attached. CORRECTION: Image removed and replaced with correct image. (rea) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
June 23, 2016 Filing 67 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by David Carter, Tamara Carter of Dr. Juan Felix on June 26, 2016 at 8:30 a.m. (Attachment: #1 PTO 38 - Depo Protocol)(Kuntz, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
June 17, 2016 Filing 66 OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #63 Second Amended Notice to Take Deposition of Dr. Christina Pramudji (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
June 16, 2016 Filing 65 RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS to #64 Notice of Deposition of Paul Michaels, M.D. by David Carter, Tamara Carter (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Kuntz, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
June 9, 2016 Filing 64 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Paul Michaels, M.D. on June 18, 2016 at 8:00 a.m. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
June 9, 2016 Filing 63 SECOND AMENDED NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by David Carter, Tamara Carter of Dr. Christina Pramudji on July 6, 2016 at 3:15 p.m. (Attachment: #1 PTO 38 Depo Protocol)(Kuntz, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
June 8, 2016 Filing 62 FIRST AMENDED NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by David Carter, Tamara Carter of Dr. Christina Pramudji on June 9, 2016 at 12:30 p.m. (Attachment: #1 PTO 38 Depo Protocol)(Kuntz, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
June 7, 2016 Filing 61 EXHIBIT - Pretrial Order #38 (Deposition Protocol) by David Carter, Tamara Carter to #60 Notice to Take Deposition of Dr. Christina Pramudji. (Kuntz, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
June 7, 2016 Filing 60 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by David Carter, Tamara Carter of Dr. Christina Pramudji on June 9, 2016 at 12:30 p.m. (Kuntz, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
June 3, 2016 Filing 59 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Defendants' Designation and Disclosure of General and Case Specific Expert Witnesses and Defendants' Non-Retained Expert Disclosures (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
May 18, 2016 Filing 58 CROSS NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Christopher Tenggardjaja on May 25, 2016 at 8:30 a.m. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Subpoena, #2 Appendix Schedule A, #3 Appendix Deposition Protocol)(Modak-Truran, Anita) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
May 13, 2016 Filing 57 RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS to #56 Notice of Deposition of Dr. Daniel Elliott by David Carter, Tamara Carter (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Kuntz, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
May 12, 2016 Filing 56 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Daniel Elliott on May 14, 2016 at 8:00 a.m. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
May 11, 2016 Filing 55 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Danny L. Curtis on behalf of David Carter, Tamara Carter. (Curtis, Danny) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
May 6, 2016 Filing 54 NOTICE (AMENDED) of Independent Medical Examination by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Modak-Truran, Anita) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
May 6, 2016 Filing 53 NOTICE of Independent Medical Examination by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Modak-Truran, Anita) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
May 5, 2016 Filing 52 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by David Carter, Tamara Carter for Plaintiffs' Designation and Disclosure of General and Case-Specific Expert Witnesses (Cartmell, Thomas) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
May 5, 2016 Filing 51 AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Tamara Carter for Answers to Defendants Ethicon, Inc.'s and Johnson & Johnson's First Set of Interrogatories, Responses to First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things, and Responses to First Set of Requests for Admissions (Kuntz, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
May 5, 2016 Filing 50 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Tamara Carter for Answers to Defendants Ethicon, Inc.'s and Johnson & Johnson's First Set of Interrogatories, Responses to First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things, and Responses to First Set of Requests for Admissions (Kuntz, Jeffrey) (Modified on 5/8/2016 to remove party filer)(skh). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
April 12, 2016 Filing 49 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by David Carter, Tamara Carter for Plaintiffs' First Amended Response to Defendants' First Request for Production of Documents and Things (Kuntz, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
April 6, 2016 Filing 48 FIRST AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by David Carter, Tamara Carter of Christopher Tenggardjaja, M.D. on May 25, 2016 at 8:30 a.m. (Attachment: #1 PTO 38 Depo Protocol)(Kuntz, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
April 5, 2016 Filing 47 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Defendants' Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things to Plaintiffs, Defendants' First Requests for Admission to Plaintiffs, and Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiffs (Walker, Jordan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
April 4, 2016 Filing 46 CROSS NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Geoffrey Hsieh on May 11, 2016 at 2:00 p.m. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Subpoena, #2 Appendix Deposition Protocol)(Modak-Truran, Anita) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
April 4, 2016 Filing 45 CROSS NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Avi Weiss on April 14, 2016 at 12:30 p.m. (Attachment: #1 Appendix Subpoena, #2 Appendix Deposition Protocol)(Modak-Truran, Anita) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
March 30, 2016 Filing 44 SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by David Carter, Tamara Carter of Geoffrey Hsieh, M.D. on May 11, 2016 at 2:00 p.m. (Attachment: #1 PTO 38 Depo Protocol)(Kuntz, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
March 28, 2016 Filing 43 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITIONS by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Tamara Carter and David Carter on April 7, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. and 1:00 p.m. (Modak-Truran, Anita) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
March 24, 2016 Filing 42 FIRST AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by David Carter, Tamara Carter of Avi Weiss, M.D. on April 14, 2016 at 12:30 p.m. (Attachment: #1 PTO 38 Depo Protocol)(Kuntz, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
March 15, 2016 Filing 41 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by David Carter, Tamara Carter of Christopher Tenggardjaja, M.D. on April 13, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. (Attachment: #1 PTO #38)(Kuntz, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
March 14, 2016 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by David Carter, Tamara Carter for Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' First Request for Production of Documents and Things (Kuntz, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
March 10, 2016 Filing 39 FIRST AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by David Carter, Tamara Carter of Geoffrey Hsieh, M.D. on April 20, 2016 at 2:00 p.m. (Attachment: #1 PTO #38)(Kuntz, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
February 16, 2016 Filing 38 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Diane K. Watkins on behalf of David Carter, Tamara Carter. (Watkins, Diane) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
February 11, 2016 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Defendants' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things to Plaintiffs (Modak-Truran, Anita) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
January 4, 2016 Filing 36 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Jordan N. Walker on behalf of Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson. (Walker, Jordan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
November 20, 2015 Filing 35 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Geoffrey Hsieh on 03/07/2016 at 9:00 a.m. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
November 20, 2015 Filing 34 PRETRIAL ORDER # 206 (Docket Control Order - Wave 2 Cases) With the selection of the cases on the attached Exhibit A (Wave 2 cases), it is ORDERED that the following deadlines shall apply in the Ethicon Wave 2 cases as set forth herein: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due 1/19/2016; Defendant Fact Sheets due 2/19/2016; Deadline for written discovery requests due 4/05/2016; Expert Disclosure by Plaintiffs due 5/5/2016; Expert Disclosure by Defendants due 6/3/2016; Expert Disclosure for Rebuttal Purposes due 6/17/2016; Deposition Deadline and close of discovery due 7/01/2016; Filing of Dispositive Motions due 7/08/2016; Responses to Dispositive Motions due 7/25/2016; Reply to Response to Dispositive Motions due 8/04/2016; Filing of Daubert Motions due 7/21/2016; Responses to Daubert Motions due 8/08/2016; and Reply to Response to Daubert Motions due 8/18/2016. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: a consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 6/10/2016, any response is due 6/20/2016, and any reply is due 6/30/2016. By no later than 5/16/2016, the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases ready for transfer, remand or trial, and the parties shall submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 5/24/2016. Signed by Joseph R. Goodwin on 11/20/2015. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit A) (cc: Clerk of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation; attys) (REF: MDL 2327; Wave 2 Cases) (mmw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
November 20, 2015 Filing 33 EXHIBIT (Pretrial Order # 38 (Deposition Protocol)) by David Carter, Tamara Carter to #31 Notice of Video Deposition of Geoffrey Hsieh, M.D. (Kuntz, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
November 20, 2015 Filing 32 EXHIBIT (Pretrial Order # 38 (Deposition Protocol)) by David Carter, Tamara Carter to #30 Notice of Video Deposition of Avi Weiss M.D. (Kuntz, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
November 20, 2015 Filing 31 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by David Carter, Tamara Carter of Geoffrey Hsieh, M.D. on December 8, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. (Kuntz, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
November 20, 2015 Filing 30 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by David Carter, Tamara Carter of Avi Weiss, M.D. on December 7, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. (Kuntz, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 MOTION by Tony W. Edwards and The Edwards Law Firm to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Plaintiffs Tamara Carter, David Carter. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/25/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (ts) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
June 24, 2015 Filing 28 MOTION by Tony W. Edwards and The Edwards Law Firm to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Plaintiffs Tamara Carter, David Carter (Edwards, Tony) (Modified on 6/24/2015 to add party filer) (skh). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
June 15, 2015 Filing 27 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Gregory Neil McEwen on behalf of Tamara Carter. (McEwen, Gregory) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting JOINT MOTION filed in MDL 2325 by the Edwards Law Firm for Substitution of Tony Edwards as Counsel and Withdraw of Counsel Jackqualyn Quinton and Mark Thetford; the Clerk is directed to substitute Tony Edwards as counsel for the plaintiffs in every case in which Jackqualyn R. Quinton and Mark S. Thetford appear and terminate Jackqualyn R. Quinton and Mark S. Thetford. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/15/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
May 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: Based on representation of counsel that Laura H. Dixon no longer represents any party in this MDL or any party in any member case, the above named counsel is terminated where she appears as counsel for any party in this MDL and in any member case. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/5/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (all) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
November 16, 2012 Filing 24 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED BY CERTIFIED MAIL for Ethicon, LLC, Ethicon, LLC served on 11/7/2012, answer due 11/28/2012. (Thetford, Mark) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
November 16, 2012 Filing 23 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Susan M. Robinson on behalf of Ethicon, LLC. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
November 16, 2012 Filing 22 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Philip J. Combs on behalf of Ethicon, LLC. (Combs, Philip) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
November 16, 2012 Filing 21 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, LLC. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
October 26, 2012 Filing 20 SUMMONS ISSUED by the Clerk on behalf of Tamara Carter, and David Carter for Ethicon, LLC, re: #17 Short Form Complaint - Ethicon, Inc., returnable 21 days. Original Summons and 2 copies mailed to Mark S. Thetford for service. (mmw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO SPECIFIC DEFENDANTS/ORDER dismissing ONLY Ethicon Women's Health & Urology and Gynecare. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/24/2012. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skh) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
October 18, 2012 Filing 18 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO SPECIFIC DEFENDANTS Ethicon Women's Health & Urology and Gynecare by David Carter, Tamara Carter (Thetford, Mark) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
October 16, 2012 Filing 17 AMENDED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT filed by David Carter, Tamara Carter against Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Attachment: #1 Proposed Summons)(Thetford, Mark) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
July 19, 2012 Filing 16 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
July 19, 2012 Filing 15 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kari L. Sutherland on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Sutherland, Kari) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
July 18, 2012 Filing 14 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Laura H. Dixon on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Dixon, Laura) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
July 18, 2012 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED BY CERTIFIED MAIL for Ethicon Women's Health and Urology, Gynecare. Ethicon Women's Health and Urology served on 7/13/2012, answer due 8/3/2012; Gynecare served on 7/13/2012, answer due 8/3/2012. (Thetford, Mark)[Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
July 2, 2012 Filing 12 SUMMONS ISSUED by the Clerk on behalf of Tamara Carter, David Carter for Ethicon Women's Health and Urology, Gynecare, re: #1 Complaint, returnable 21 days. Original Summons and 2 copies for each defendant returned to plaintiff's counsel for service. (tmh) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
June 29, 2012 Filing 11 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Tamara Carter, David Carter for Ethicon Women's Health and Urology (Thetford, Mark) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
June 29, 2012 Filing 10 SUMMONS TO BE REISSUED SUBMITTED by Tamara Carter, David Carter for Gynecare (Thetford, Mark) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
June 24, 2012 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by William M. Gage on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
June 13, 2012 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED for Gynecare. Date Returned Unexecuted: 6/11/2012. (Thetford, Mark) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
June 13, 2012 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED BY CERTIFIED MAIL for Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. Ethicon, Inc. served on 6/4/2012, answer due 6/25/2012; Johnson & Johnson served on 6/4/2012, answer due 6/25/2012. (Thetford, Mark) M [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
June 6, 2012 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Susan M. Robinson on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
June 6, 2012 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Philip J. Combs on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Combs, Philip) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
June 6, 2012 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
May 25, 2012 Filing 3 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER #7 (Change of Court Contact Information) entered on 05/16/2012 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (klc) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
May 24, 2012 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED by the Clerk on behalf of Tamara Carter and David Carter for Ethicon, Inc., Gynecare, and Johnson & Johnson, re: #1 Complaint, returnable 21 days. Original Summons and 2 copies for each defendant mailed to Mark S. Thetford for service. (cbo) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]
May 23, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $350.00. Receipt # 0425-1854050. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cbo) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 7/1/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon Women's Health and Urology
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gynecare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Anita Modak-Truran
Represented By: Matthew P. Smith
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: Pamela Lawrence
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Philip J. Combs
Represented By: Kari L. Sutherland
Represented By: Christy D. Jones
Represented By: Laura H. Dixon
Represented By: Jordan N. Walker
Represented By: Sihomara L. Graves
Represented By: Robert R. McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon LLC
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Philip J. Combs
Represented By: Robert R. McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Anita Modak-Truran
Represented By: Matthew P. Smith
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: Pamela Lawrence
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Philip J. Combs
Represented By: Kari L. Sutherland
Represented By: Christy D. Jones
Represented By: Laura H. Dixon
Represented By: Jordan N. Walker
Represented By: Sihomara L. Graves
Represented By: Robert R. McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara Carter
Represented By: Thomas P. Cartmell
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Kuntz
Represented By: Danny L. Curtis
Represented By: Diane K. Watkins
Represented By: Jackqualyn R. Quinton
Represented By: Gregory Neil McEwen
Represented By: Mark S. Thetford
Represented By: Tony W. Edwards
Represented By: Thomas P Cartmell
Represented By: Diane K Watkins
Represented By: Peter C Wetherall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Carter
Represented By: Thomas P. Cartmell
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Kuntz
Represented By: Danny L. Curtis
Represented By: Diane K. Watkins
Represented By: Jackqualyn R. Quinton
Represented By: Gregory Neil McEwen
Represented By: Mark S. Thetford
Represented By: Tony W. Edwards
Represented By: Thomas P Cartmell
Represented By: Diane K Watkins
Represented By: Peter C Wetherall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?