Busbin et al v. Shotgun Creek Investments, LLC et al
Appellee: Shotgun Investments Nevada, LLC, Shotgun Creek Investments, LLC, Northern Trust Company and Shotgun Creek Las Vegas, LLC
Appellant: Bradley J Busbin
In Re: Desert Land, LLC
Trustee: US Trustee
Case Number: 2:2020cv01299
Filed: July 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2020 Filing 15 STATUS REPORT forwarded by the U.S. Bankruptcy Court. One transcript has been ordered; estimated completion within 30 days of 8/14/2020. (DRS)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying #5 Motion to Stay Case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/10/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
August 3, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to #5 Motion to Stay Case by Appellant Bradley J Busbin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (Wray, Mark)
August 3, 2020 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Judge James C. Mahan for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:20-cv-01299-JCM. (no image attached) (EDS)
August 3, 2020 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson on 8/3/2020. By Deputy Clerk: Denise Saavedra. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson recuses himself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
August 3, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:20-cv-01299-KJD. (no image attached) (EDS)
August 3, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/3/2020. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey recuses herself from this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAD)
July 31, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #5 Motion to Stay Case by Appellee Northern Trust Company. Replies due by 8/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Gerrard, Douglas)
July 29, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/29/2020. Good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that appellant Busbin's #6 Emergency Motion to Shorten Time is GRANTED. Any response to appellant Busbin's #5 Motion to Stay Case is due by 7/31/2020. Any reply is due by 8/3/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CH)
July 29, 2020 Filing 6 Emergency MOTION to Shorten Time re #5 Motion to Stay Case by Appellant Bradley J Busbin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Wray, Mark)
July 28, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Stay Case by Appellant Bradley J Busbin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6) (Wray, Mark)
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 WITHDRAWAL of #3 Motion to Stay Case by Appellant Bradley J Busbin. (Wray, Mark)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Stay Case by Appellant Bradley J Busbin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (Wray, Mark)
July 14, 2020 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/14/2020. IT IS ORDERED that the designation of reporters and recorders transcripts (if any) as required by Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009(a) shall be filed with the clerk of bankruptcy court so the certificate of readiness may be transmitted timely to the district court. If the designation was previously filed with the clerk of BAP, counsel shall file a copy of the same with the clerk of bankruptcy court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all future documents filed in connection with this appeal shall bear the bankruptcy case number, adversary case number (if any) and the district court civil case number. For Bankruptcy Appeals, Attorneys are required to file Verified Petitions in accordance with LR IA 11-2. Verified Petition due by 8/28/2020. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 13, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT, Bankruptcy Court case number BK-18-12454-gs, Adversary Proceeding: 19-01108-gs. (Attachments: #1 Appeal Memorandum, #2 Transmittal, #3 Notice of Referral) (MR) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/14/2020: #4 Second Notice of Referral) (MR).
July 13, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. (MR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Busbin et al v. Shotgun Creek Investments, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Shotgun Investments Nevada, LLC
Represented By: Douglas D. Gerrard
Represented By: Brigid Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Shotgun Creek Investments, LLC
Represented By: Douglas D. Gerrard
Represented By: Brigid Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Northern Trust Company
Represented By: Douglas D. Gerrard
Represented By: Anthony Warren Austin
Represented By: Cathy L. Reece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Shotgun Creek Las Vegas, LLC
Represented By: Douglas D. Gerrard
Represented By: Brigid Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Bradley J Busbin
Represented By: Mark D Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Desert Land, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: US Trustee
Represented By: U.S. Trustee, Las Vegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?