Kristek v. Travelers Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Courtney Kristek
Defendant: The Travelers Home & Marine Insurance Company, 360 Insurance & Investments, LLC and Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv01314
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 41 CLERK'S NOTICE regarding ECF No. #40 . Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c) by attorney Courtney L. Dolan. The wrong event was selected. The Court has corrected and changed the event from Motion Leave to File to Motion Leave to Appear Telephonically. No further action is required at this time. Do not refile document. (no image attached) (SLD)
September 8, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically re: 39 Minute Order, by Plaintiff Courtney Kristek. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Dolan, Courtney) Modified on 9/8/2020 to link document pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d) and change event (SLD).
September 1, 2020 Filing 39 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/1/2020. By Deputy Clerk: Danielle Cacciabaudo. IT IS ORDERED that the parties appear IN PERSON for a hearing re: #5 , #6 , #17 Motions to Dismiss and #10 , #14 Motions to Remand on 9/22/2020 at 02:00 PM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. The telephonic hearing scheduled for 9/8/2020 is VACATED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
August 25, 2020 Filing 38 ERRATA to #37 Reply by Defendant 360 Insurance & Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Rasmussen, R.)
August 25, 2020 Filing 37 REPLY to Response to #17 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant 360 Insurance & Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Rasmussen, R.)
August 21, 2020 Filing 36 REPLY to #24 Response to #10 Motion to Remand, by Plaintiff Courtney Kristek. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (Dolan, Courtney) Modified on 8/24/2020 to link to Motion (SLD).
August 20, 2020 Filing 35 REPLY to #28 Response to #10 Motion to Remand, by Plaintiff Courtney Kristek. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Dolan, Courtney) Modified on 8/20/2020 to link to Motion (SLD).
August 19, 2020 Filing 34 REPLY to #30 Response by Plaintiff Courtney Kristek. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Dolan, Courtney)
August 19, 2020 Filing 33 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 5-1(b). ECF No. #30 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b) by attorneys Michael J. Nunez and R. Scott Rasmussen. Please note the signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. Do not refile document. (no image attached) (SLD)
August 19, 2020 Filing 32 CLERK'S NOTICE regarding ECF No. #31 . Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c) by attorney Courtney Dolan. The wrong event was selected. The title of the docket entry does not match the title of the document. The Court has corrected and changed the event from Reply to Response. No further action is required at this time. Do not refile document. (no image attached) (SLD)
August 19, 2020 Filing 31 AMENDED RESPONSE REPLY to #17 Motion to Dismiss re: 27 Minute Order, by Plaintiff Courtney Kristek. Replies due by 8/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Dolan, Courtney) Modified on 8/19/2020 to change event, set Reply deadline, and link to Minute Order (SLD).
August 18, 2020 Filing 30 RESPONSE to #14 Motion by Defendant 360 Insurance & Investments, LLC. Replies due by 8/25/2020. (Nunez, Michael)
August 18, 2020 Filing 29 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Filer's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #28 . Attorney Rachel L. Wise is advised to review and update his/her user account information. (no image attached) (SLD)
August 18, 2020 Filing 28 RESPONSE to #10 Motion to Remand to Agency, by Defendant Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company. Replies due by 8/25/2020. (Butterfield, Chad)
August 17, 2020 Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/17/2020. ORDER striking #25 Motion to Remand and #26 Response to 360 Insurance's Motion to Dismiss. In response to each of the defendants' motions to dismiss, plaintiff Courtney Kristek filed a document entitled "Motion to Remand and Plaintiff's Response to" each motion to dismiss. Kristek's filings violate several rules of this court. First, Local Rule IC 2-2 requires each type of relief requested to be brought in a separate document, so Kristek should have filed a singular motion to remand and a singular and separate response to each motion to dismiss. Second, Local Rule 7-3 limits motions to remand and responses to motions to dismiss to 24 pages. Each of Kristek's filings exceeds that limit: document 10 is 26 pages long #10 , and documents 14 and 25 are 31 pages each #14 #25 . Finally, there is no reason to file any particular type of request for relief multiple times, yet Kristek has filed her motion to remand in response to EACH of the defendants' motions to dismiss, for a total of three motions to remand #10 #14 #25 . Because defendants Travelers and Hartford have already responded to Kristek's overlength briefs with replies, striking those rule-violative filings would only serve to frustrate judicial economy and further crowd the docket in this case. However, 360 Insurance & Investments, LLC has not yet filed its reply in support of its motion to dismiss #17 . Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Kristek's rule-violative Motion for Remand and Plaintiff's Response to Defendant 360 Insurance Agency's Motion to Dismiss #25 #26 is HEREBY STRUCK. Plaintiff has until 5 p.m. on 8/20/2020 to file an amended response to 360 Insurance's motion to dismiss #17 that does not exceed 24 pages. If she believes that yet another motion to remand is necessitated, she must file it in a separate document that does not exceed 24 pages by 5 p.m. on 8/20/2020, and she must state on the first page of that motion why a third motion to remand is warranted. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAD)
August 17, 2020 Filing 26 STRICKEN per 27 Minute Order. (SLD) REPLY to #17 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Courtney Kristek. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Dolan, Courtney) Modified on 8/18/2020 (SLD).
August 17, 2020 Filing 25 STRICKEN per 27 Minute Order. (SLD) First MOTION FOR Remand by Plaintiff Courtney Kristek. Responses due by 8/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Dolan, Courtney) Modified on 8/18/2020 (SLD).
August 17, 2020 Filing 24 RESPONSE to #10 Motion to Remand to Agency, by Defendant The Travelers Home & Marine Insurance Company. Replies due by 8/24/2020. (Reeves, William)
August 14, 2020 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to #6 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company. (Butterfield, Chad)
August 14, 2020 Filing 22 First STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Courtney Kristek. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Dolan, Courtney)
August 14, 2020 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #20 Reply. Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c). The wrong event was selected. The title of the docket entry does not match the title of the document. ERROR: Document appears to be a Status Report. The document also has the incorrect attorney listed at the top of the document. Counsel is advised to correct and refile ECF No. #20 using the appropriate docket entry event. (no image attached) (EDS)
August 14, 2020 Filing 20 ERROR: Incorrect event selected and errors on document. Counsel advised to correct and refile. REPLY to #19 Status Report by Plaintiff Courtney Kristek. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Dolan, Courtney)
August 14, 2020 Filing 19 STATUS REPORT by Defendant The Travelers Home & Marine Insurance Company. (Reeves, William)
August 11, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by 360 Insurance & Investments, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Nunez, Michael)
August 11, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant 360 Insurance & Investments, LLC. Responses due by 8/25/2020. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 9/25/2020. (Nunez, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 11, 2020 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to #5 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant The Travelers Home & Marine Insurance Company. (Reeves, William)
August 7, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE to #6 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Courtney Kristek. Replies due by 8/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Dolan, Courtney)
August 7, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION FOR Remand re #6 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Courtney Kristek. Responses due by 8/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Dolan, Courtney)
August 5, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE REPLY to Response to #5 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Courtney Kristek. Replies due by 8/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Dolan, Courtney) Modified on 8/5/2020 to change event and add Reply deadline (SLD).
August 4, 2020 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #10 . Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(b) by attorney Courtney L. Dolan. For each type of relief requested or purpose, a separate document must be filed. Counsel is advised to refile ECF No. #10 along with the attachments to address the Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss using the event Response to Motion to be in compliance with LR IC 2-2(b) and LR IC 2-2(c). (no image attached) (SLD)
August 4, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE regarding ECF No. #10 . Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c) by attorney Courtney L. Dolan. The wrong event was selected. The title of the docket entry does not match the title of the document. The Court has corrected and changed the event from Motion Miscellaneous to Motion Remand to State Agency. (no image attached) (SLD)
August 4, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION For Remand And Opposition to Defendant's Motion To Dismiss by Plaintiff Courtney Kristek. Responses due by 8/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Dolan, Courtney) Modified on 8/4/2020 (SLD).
August 4, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Courtney Kristek. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Dolan, Courtney)
August 3, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE Setting Telephonic Hearing on #5 and #6 MOTIONS to Dismiss: Telephonic Motions Hearing set for 9/8/2020 at 02:30 PM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey.The parties are instructed to call 888-808-6929, enter the access code 2178469, and remain on the line until the Courtroom Administrator joins the call. The use of a cell phone or speaker phone during the call is prohibited. The call must be made using a land line. (no image attached) (DC)
July 27, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, Other Affiliate The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company added. (Butterfield, Chad)
July 27, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company. Responses due by 8/10/2020. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 9/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibit, #2 Exhibit A) (Butterfield, Chad) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
July 23, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant The Travelers Home & Marine Insurance Company. Responses due by 8/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Dec. of W. Reeves (Exs. A-L)) (Reeves, William)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant The Travelers Home & Marine Insurance Company. (Reeves, William)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/16/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 7/31/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 8/15/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
July 16, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (DRS)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by The Travelers Home & Marine Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent The Travelers Indemnity Company, Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc., Corporate Parent The Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc. for The Travelers Home & Marine Insurance Company added. (Reeves, William)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Clark County District Court, Case Number A-20-817759-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-6085610) by The Travelers Home & Marine Insurance Company. (Reeves, William) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kristek v. Travelers Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Kristek
Represented By: Courtney L. Dolan
Represented By: Courtney Dolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Travelers Home & Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: William C. Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 360 Insurance & Investments, LLC
Represented By: R. Scott Rasmussen
Represented By: Michael J. Nunez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company
Represented By: Chad C. Butterfield
Represented By: Rachel L. Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?