Helfrich v. State of Nevada
Petitioner: Peter Jason Helfrich
Respondent: State of Nevada
Case Number: 2:2020cv01319
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Unable to Forward re #5 Order,, addressed to Peter Jason Helfrich. (DRS)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Plaintiff shall either file an Application to Proceed in forma paupers or pay the filing fees in full on or before 9/3/2020. The Clerk shall mail plaintiff the proper form and instructions, a copy of the initiating documents and a copy of this order. Initiating documents are not yet filed by the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 8/4/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; Non-Inmate IFP Application and instructions, Notice and consent to service by email; copy of 1-1 and 3 enclosed with copy of order. - DRS) Modified on 8/4/2020 (DRS).
July 28, 2020 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT to 3 Affidavit by Petitioner Peter Jason Helfrich. Limited to Case participants only as it contains personal identifiers. (DRS)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (DRS)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Removal - Petition is restricted to Case participants only as it contains personal identifiers. ) (DRS)
July 16, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Helfrich v. State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Peter Jason Helfrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?