Luna-Kelly v. Santander Consumer USA Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Grisel Luna-Kelly
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC, Trans Union LLC and Santander Consumer USA Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01321
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Kent J Dawson
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Equifax Information Services LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services LLC added. (Thompson, Jeremy)
August 18, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Equifax Information Services LLC.(Thompson, Jeremy)
August 18, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Trans Union LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union LLC added. (Bergh, Jennifer)
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Trans Union LLC.(Bergh, Jennifer)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jennifer Rebecca Bergh on behalf of Defendant Trans Union LLC. (Bergh, Jennifer)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Santander Consumer USA Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Santander Consumer USA Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Banco Santander, S.A. for Santander Consumer USA Inc. added. (Jorgensen, J)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Santander Consumer USA Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/2/2020.(Jorgensen, J) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services LLC, Santander Consumer USA Inc., Trans Union LLC re #1 Complaint. (JQC)
July 17, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (JQC)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Grisel Luna-Kelly. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kind, Michael)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6087082) by Grisel Luna-Kelly. Proof of service due by 10/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (Kind, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luna-Kelly v. Santander Consumer USA Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grisel Luna-Kelly
Represented By: Michael Kind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: Jeremy J. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Rebecca Bergh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santander Consumer USA Inc.
Represented By: Adrienne R. Brantley-Lomeli
Represented By: J Christopher Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?