Shannon v. Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Zachary Shannon
Defendant: Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv01391
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Richard F Boulware
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Filing 14 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Zachary Shannon. (Mittin, Lawrence)
August 14, 2020 Filing 13 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (O'Briant, Priscilla)
August 14, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER with Jury Demand re #1 Petition for Removal, filed by Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 9/28/2020.(O'Briant, Priscilla) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 12, 2020 Filing 11 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (O'Briant, Priscilla)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #9 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company answer due 8/14/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 8/11/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
August 10, 2020 Filing 9 Second STIPULATION Extending Defendant Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company's Time to Respond to Complaint re #1 Petition for Removal, by Defendant Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (O'Briant, Priscilla)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #7 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company answer due 8/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 8/10/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
August 3, 2020 Filing 7 First STIPULATION Extending The Defendant Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company's Time to Respond to Complaint re #1 Petition for Removal, by Defendant Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (O'Briant, Priscilla)
July 28, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company for Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company added. (O'Briant, Priscilla)
July 28, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Zachary Shannon. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Mittin, Lawrence)
July 28, 2020 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Plaintiff Zachary Shannon. (Mittin, Lawrence)
July 28, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
July 28, 2020 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/28/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 8/12/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 8/27/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
July 28, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (JQC)
July 27, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court Clark County Nevada, Case Number A-20-813913-C, (Filing fee paid $ 400) by Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Receipt) (JQC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shannon v. Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Damon A Stemen
Represented By: Robert W Freeman, Jr.
Represented By: Priscilla Louise O'Briant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Shannon
Represented By: Lawrence E. Mittin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?