Alcaraz v. Conagra Brands, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kyle A. Alcaraz
Defendant: Conagra Brands, Inc., Conagra Foods, Inc. and Sam's West, Inc. doing business as Sam's Club
Case Number: 2:2020cv01414
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: James C Mahan
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (DRS)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER granting #12 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 4/2/2021. Motions due by 5/3/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/2/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 9/14/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
September 14, 2020 Filing 12 Joint Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Kyle A. Alcaraz. (Richardson, Danielle)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ted D Hartman for Conagra Brands, Inc.,Ted D Hartman for Sam's West, Inc. and approving J. Christopher Jorgensen Designation of Local Counsel Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/4/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
August 28, 2020 Filing 10 Joint STATUS REPORT Pursuant to the Court's July 30, 2020 Minute Order by Defendants Conagra Brands, Inc., Conagra Foods, Inc., Sam's West, Inc.. (Jorgensen, J)
August 25, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Ted D. Harman and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel J Christopher Jorgensen (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6143447) by Defendants Conagra Brands, Inc., Sam's West, Inc.. (Jorgensen, J)
August 14, 2020 Filing 8 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Conagra Brands, Inc., Conagra Foods, Inc., Sam's West, Inc.. (Jorgensen, J)
August 5, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Sam's West, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Walmart Inc. for Sam's West, Inc. added. (Jorgensen, J)
August 5, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal, filed by Sam's West, Inc. (Jorgensen, J)
August 5, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER with Jury Demand re #1 Petition for Removal, filed by Conagra Brands, Inc., Conagra Foods, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 9/19/2020.(Jorgensen, J) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
July 30, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Conagra Brands, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Conagra Foods, Inc., Other Affiliate Conagra Brands, Inc. for Conagra Brands, Inc. added. (Jorgensen, J) Modified on 7/30/2020 (SLD).
July 30, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 7/30/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 8/14/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 8/29/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
July 30, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (DRS)
July 29, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Conagra Brands, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Conagra Foods, Inc., Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc., Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Associates, Inc., Other Affiliate Conagra Brands, Inc. for Conagra Brands, Inc. added. (Jorgensen, J) Modified on 7/29/2020 (SLD).
July 29, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-20-817478-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-6104105) by Conagra Foods, Inc., Conagra Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Jorgensen, J) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alcaraz v. Conagra Brands, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle A. Alcaraz
Represented By: Danielle J. Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conagra Brands, Inc.
Represented By: J Christopher Jorgensen
Represented By: Ted D Hartman
Represented By: Adrienne R. Brantley-Lomeli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conagra Foods, Inc.
Represented By: J Christopher Jorgensen
Represented By: Adrienne R. Brantley-Lomeli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam's West, Inc. doing business as Sam's Club
Represented By: J Christopher Jorgensen
Represented By: Ted D Hartman
Represented By: Adrienne R. Brantley-Lomeli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?